Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] |
10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
16.05.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
18.10.2002 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
16.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
28.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant | |
28.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
13.04.2002 | Renewal fee | |
08.03.2002 | First examination report | |
07.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant | |
30.11.2001 | Change - representative | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
01.03.2001 | Renewal fee | |
17.11.2000 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
17.11.2000 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] |
19.09.2000 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.11.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.09.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.09.1999 | PCT data prior to European publication |