EP1212237 - COMBINED CLUTCH AND TORSION DAMPER FOR WATER JET PROPULSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lauterbach, Joachim 1440 Spitfire Place Port Coquitlam British Columbia V3C 6L4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | For all designated states Lauterbach, Joachim 1440 Spitfire Place Port Coquitlam, British Columbia V3C 6L4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/24] | Representative(s) | Ehlers, Jochen Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/24] | Ehlers, Jochen Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner, Martinistrasse 24 28195 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99939880.3 | 11.08.1999 | [2002/24] | WO1999CA00793 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0112504 | Date: | 22.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1212237 | Date: | 12.06.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1212237 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B63H23/30, F16D27/112, F16D3/68, // B63H11:08 | [2002/24] | CPC: |
F16D3/68 (EP);
B63H23/30 (US);
F16D27/112 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/24] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION AUS KUPPLUNG UND DREHSCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFER FÜR EINEN WASSERSTRAHLANTRIEB | [2002/24] | English: | COMBINED CLUTCH AND TORSION DAMPER FOR WATER JET PROPULSION | [2002/24] | French: | EMBRAYAGE ET AMORTISSEUR DE TORSION COMBINES POUR PROPULSION A JET D'EAU | [2002/24] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2002 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.03.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.08.2004 | BE | 25.08.2004 | CH | 25.08.2004 | IT | 25.08.2004 | LI | 25.08.2004 | NL | 25.08.2004 | DK | 25.11.2004 | GR | 25.11.2004 | ES | 06.12.2004 | PT | 25.01.2005 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
NL | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/28] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
BE | 25.08.2004 | ||
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
ES | 06.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
DK | 25.11.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
CH | 25.08.2004 | ||
LI | 25.08.2004 | ||
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 25.08.2004 | |
GR | 25.11.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 25.08.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3868833 (NOE GERALD H, et al) [A] 1,3 * figure 2 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 17 *; | [A]US4031714 (FAUST WERNER) [A] 1 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]US4793455 (TABUCHI YASUO [JP], et al) [A] 1,5 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0460373 (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,12 * figure 2; claim 8 * * column 4, line 21 - line 30 * * column 4, line 56 - column 5, line 4 *; | [A]US5609232 (BROWNFIELD JERRY A [US], et al) [A] 1,4,10,11 * figure 1 * * column 3, line 21 - line 67 *; | [A]US5655968 (BURTON ROBERT A [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US5720635 (ROOS PAUL W [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * * column 9, line 43 - line 56 ** column 15, line 32 - line 43 *; | [YA]DE29812409U (STROMAG AG [DE]) [Y] 1-4,12 * figure 1; claim 8 * * page 4, line 1 - line 20 * * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 26 * [A] 10,11; | [EL]US5954552 (LAUTERBACH JOACHIM [CA]) [EL] 1-14 * the whole document * * L: Priority * |