EP1046146 - FIRE ALARM AND FIRE ALARM SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): DK | published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Bellerivestrasse 36 8034 Zürich / CH | [2001/02] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Siemens Building Technologies AG Cerberus Division, Alte Landstrasse 411 8708 Männedorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORDASCO, Gerald, M. 69 Lexington Avenue Maplewood, NJ 07040 / US | 02 /
WIESER, Dieter Lindenbergstrasse 10 CH-8700 Küsnacht / CH | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Dittrich, Horst Siemens Building Technologies AG Fire & Security Products 8708 Männedorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Dittrich, Horst, Dr. Siemens Building Technologies AG, Cerberus Division, Alte Landstrasse 411 8708 Männedorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 99939887.8 | 07.09.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999CH00413 | Priority number, date | EP19980117034 | 09.09.1998 Original published format: EP 98117034 | CH19980002467 | 11.12.1998 Original published format: CH 246798 | [2000/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014693 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046146 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1046146 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G08B7/06, G08B17/00 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G08B17/12 (EP);
G08B17/06 (KR);
G08B17/10 (EP);
G08B29/183 (EP);
G08B7/062 (EP);
G08B7/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | BRANDMELDER UND BRANDMELDEANLAGE | [2000/43] | English: | FIRE ALARM AND FIRE ALARM SYSTEM | [2000/43] | French: | ALARME INCENDIE ET DISPOSITIF D'ALARME INCENDIE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 02.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 02.05.2003 | DK | 02.08.2003 | PT | 04.08.2003 | [2004/23] |
Former [2004/05] | FI | 02.05.2003 | |
PT | 04.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | PT | 04.08.2003 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4074225 (VANDEWEGHE JOSEPH L) [Y] 15 * column W *; | [XY]US4796018 (NAKANISHI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 11 * column W * [Y] 15; | [A]EP0361973 (COLT INT LTD [GB]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0401038 (EMI PLC THORN [GB]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0476562 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2686177 (CERBERUS GUINARD [FR]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4241862 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP0654770 (CERBERUS AG [CH]) [DA] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9519202 (SCANSAFE INTERNATIONAL AS [DK], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9625729 (RIJLAARSDAM DESIGN HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [A] 1,11* the whole document *; | [A]WO9639687 (HATJASALO LEO [FI], et al) [A] 1,11 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE19644127 (KLINGSCH WOLFRAM PROF DR ING [DE], et al) [DA] 1,11 * the whole document * |