13.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] |
06.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
16.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
03.10.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.11.2003 [2003/47] |
05.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
29.08.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2003 [2003/42] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
06.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.07.2003 [2003/30] |
30.05.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
21.03.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
11.10.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] |
17.09.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.09.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
07.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
10.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.07.2001 |
First examination report |
|
02.07.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
18.05.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
18.05.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.07.2001 [2001/27] |
15.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|