EP1112235 - COATING FOR TOOLS USED TO PROCESS HEAT TREATED GLASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/48] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GADOW, Rainer Lärchenstrasse 5a D-84544 Aschau / DE | 02 /
BRAND, Jochen Reuterstrasse 23 D-38126 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
KILLINGER, Andreas Paracelsusstrasse 52 D-70771 Leinfelden / DE | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/27] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Mozartstrasse 17 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99940126.8 | 02.08.1999 | [2001/27] | WO1999EP05603 | Priority number, date | DE19981034968 | 03.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19834968 | [2001/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007951 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112235 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112235 | Date: | 27.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C03B40/00, C03B9/46, C03B9/48 | [2001/27] | CPC: |
C23C30/00 (EP,US);
C03B40/00 (EP,US);
C03B7/11 (EP,US);
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNG FÜR WERKZEUGE ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON WÄRMEBEHANDELTEM GLAS | [2001/27] | English: | COATING FOR TOOLS USED TO PROCESS HEAT TREATED GLASS | [2001/27] | French: | REVETEMENT POUR OUTILS UTILISES DANS LE TRAVAIL DU VERRE TREMPE | [2001/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.11.2002 | GR | 27.11.2002 | IE | 27.11.2002 | NL | 27.11.2002 | DK | 27.02.2003 | PT | 27.02.2003 | SE | 27.02.2003 | CY | 02.08.2003 | LU | 02.08.2003 | [2007/23] |
Former [2004/39] | FI | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
CY | 02.08.2003 | ||
LU | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | FI | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
CY | 02.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 27.11.2002 | |
GR | 27.11.2002 | ||
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/42] | GR | 27.11.2002 | |
IE | 27.11.2002 | ||
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/31] | GR | 27.11.2002 | |
NL | 27.11.2002 | ||
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 27.11.2002 | |
PT | 27.02.2003 | ||
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/29] | PT | 27.02.2003 | |
SE | 27.02.2003 | ||
Former [2003/19] | SE | 27.02.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5026415 (YAMAMOTO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-19; | [X]US5380349 (TANIGUCHI YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-19; | [XA]US5770294 (SAKAMOTO YASUAKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-14,19 [A] 3-6,15-18; | [PA]WO9947346 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE])[PA] 1-19 |