|
03.03.2006 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.2005 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2005 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.02.2005 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.02.2005 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.02.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2005 |
Withdrawal of designation of a Contracting State |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2004 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
27.10.2004 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2004 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.10.2004 |
Request for a decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.08.2004 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.09.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.09.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.10.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
08.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.09.2000 |
Request for extension of time limit |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.06.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.04.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
01.04.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.03.2000 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
29.03.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
23.03.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
16.03.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.03.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
15.09.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.09.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
15.09.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
20 |
|
15.09.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
7 |