28.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
23.06.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] |
14.04.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
03.03.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] |
17.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
11.11.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
28.10.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] |
11.03.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |
03.03.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.03.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.02.2005 |
Change - designated states |
published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] |
29.10.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
25.10.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.10.2004 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.10.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
25.10.2004 |
New entry: Request for decision: receipt of request |
|
25.10.2004 |
New entry: Request for decision: result |
|
06.08.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.09.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.08.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.07.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2003 |
First examination report |
|
10.04.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.09.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.06.2001 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
11.05.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] |
11.05.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] |
06.04.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.09.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|