EP1116791 - NOVEL TUMOR ANTIGEN PROTEIN SART-3 AND TUMOR ANTIGEN PEPTIDE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Green Peptide Co., Ltd. 10-4, Toori-machi, Kurume-shi Fukuoka 830-0018 / JP | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Itoh, Kyogo 2-25-9, Keyaki-dai, Kiyama-cho Miyaki-gun Saga 841-0205 / JP | ||
Former [2006/02] | For all designated states Dainippon Sumitomo Pharma Co., Ltd. 6-8, Dosho-machi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | ||
For all designated states Itoh, Kyogo 2-25-9, Keyaki-dai, Kiyama-cho Miyaki-gun, Saga 841-0205 / JP | |||
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states Sumitomo Pharmaceuticals Company, Limited 2-8, Doshomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-8510 / JP | ||
For all designated states Itoh, Kyogo 2-25-9, Keyaki-dai, Kiyama-cho Miyaki-gun, Saga 841-0205 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Kyogo 2-25-9, Keyaki-dai, Kiyama-cho Miyaki-gun, Saga 841-0205 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Masanobu 277-1, Oaza Ohashi Okawa-shi, Fukuoka 831-0021 / JP | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99940508.7 | 27.08.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999JP04622 | Priority number, date | JP19980242660 | 28.08.1998 Original published format: JP 24266098 | [2001/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012701 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116791 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116791 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12N5/10, C12P21/02, C07K14/47, C07K16/30, A61K31/70, A61K48/00, A61K38/17, A61K39/00, A61K35/12 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUES TUMOR-ANTIGEN-PROTEIN SART-3 UND TUMOR-ANTIGEN-PEPTID DAVON | [2001/29] | English: | NOVEL TUMOR ANTIGEN PROTEIN SART-3 AND TUMOR ANTIGEN PEPTIDE THEREOF | [2001/29] | French: | NOUVELLE PROTEINE D'ANTIGENE TUMORAL SART-3 ET PEPTIDE D'ANTIGENE TUMORAL DE CELLE-CI | [2001/29] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2001 | Translation filed | 28.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 24.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.10.2008 | BE | 29.10.2008 | CY | 29.10.2008 | DK | 29.10.2008 | FI | 29.10.2008 | NL | 29.10.2008 | SE | 29.01.2009 | GR | 30.01.2009 | PT | 30.03.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
GR | 30.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
DK | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
SE | 29.01.2009 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
BE | 29.10.2008 | ||
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 29.10.2008 | |
FI | 29.10.2008 | ||
NL | 29.10.2008 | ||
PT | 30.03.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP1033401 (GENSET SA [FR]) [E] 1 * page 5934 *; | [E]WO0055174 (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [E] 1-7,16-19,24,25 * Seq. ID 1496; 99% identitty in 569 aa overlap (395-963:10-578); page 1320 - page 1322 *; | [X] - OHARA O. ET AL., "Human mRNA for KIA0156 gene, complete cds.", EMBL, (19950825), XP002182056 [X] 1,5,16,17 * 100% identity over 963 aas * | [X] - TOH U. ET AL., "HLA class I-restricted and tumor-specific cytotoxic T lymphocytes from metastatic lymph nodes of esophageal cancer", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, vol. 177, pages 137 - 143, XP002182054 [X] 20-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cimm.1997.1105 | [ ] - DUMAS ET AL., "5' ESTs", EMBL, XP002182855 [ ] * Human secreted protein 5934 90% identity in 93 aa overlap (1-93:1-93) * | [PX] - YANG D. ET AL., "Identification of a gene for a protein possessing shared tumor epitopes capable of inducing HLA-A24-restricted cytotoxic T lymphocytes in cancer patients", CANCER RESEARCH, (19990815), vol. 59, pages 4056 - 4063, XP002182055 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document * | International search | [A] - SHIGEKI SHICHIJO ET AL., "A Gene Encoding Antigenic Peptides of Human Squamous Cell Carcinoma Recognized by Cytotoxic T Lymphocytes", J. EXP. MED., (19980202), vol. 187, no. 3, pages 277 - 288, XP002932468 | [A] - RUMI GOHARA, "Histocompatibility Leukocyte Antigen-A2402-restricted Cytotoxic T Lymphocytes Recognizing Adenocarcinoma in Tumor-infiltrating Lymphocytes of Patients with Coiono Cancer", JPN. J. CANCER RES., (199702), vol. 88, no. 2, pages 198 - 204, XP002932469 | [A] - TAKAHIRO NAGASE, "Prediction of the Coding Sequences of Unidentified Human Genes. IV. The Coding Sequences of 40 New Genes (KIAA0121-KIAA0160) Deduced by Analysis of cDNA Clones from Human Cell Line KG-1", J. CLIN. INVEST., (199508), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 167 - 174, XP002932470 | [A] - P. YOTNDA, "Cytotoxic T Cell Response against the Chimeric ETV6-AML1 Protein in Childhood Acute Lymphoblastic Leukemia", J. CLIN. INVEST., (199807), vol. 102, no. 2, pages 455 - 462, XP002932471 | [A] - TAKENORI TAKAHASHI, "Recognition of gp43 Tumor-Associated Antigen Peptide by both HLA-A2 Restricted CTL Lines and Antibodies from Melanoma Patients", CELLULAR IMMUNOLOGY, (19970615), vol. 178, no. 2, pages 162 - 171, XP002932472 |