Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1031150 | Global Dossier | 07.12.2005 | B1 | EP1031150 | 30.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP9904764 | 02.09.1999 | JP25880998 | 11.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69928766T | 27.07.2006 | T2 | DE69928766D1 | 12.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP9904764 | 02.09.1999 | JP25880998 | 11.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6456582 | 24.09.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP9904764 | 02.09.1999 | JP25880998 | 11.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0016326 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP25880998 | 11.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3499450B | Global Dossier | 23.02.2004 | B2 | JP2000090538 | 31.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25880998 | 11.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1120489C | 03.09.2003 | C | CN1277714 | 20.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP25880998 | 11.09.1998 |