EP1031150 - AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CHUCKING A CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Kenwood 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD 14-6 Dougenzaka 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0043 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Masato 3-3946-2-805, Iriya Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0024 / JP | 02 /
SUWA, Takafumi 2-6-3-304, Mukoudai-cyo Tanashi-shi, Tokyo 188-0013 / JP | 03 /
ASANO, Takahiro 1-46-10-302, Akatsuki-cyo Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 193-0043 / JP | 04 /
ONO, Atuomi Room 2-202, 3-16-2, Minami Ohsawa Hachiouji-shi, Tokyo 192-0364 / JP | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99940627.5 | 02.09.1999 | [2000/35] | WO1999JP04764 | Priority number, date | JP19980258809 | 11.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25880998 | [2000/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016326 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1031150 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1031150 | Date: | 07.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/04 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
G11B33/124 (EP,US);
G11B17/0438 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINSPANNEN EINER KASSETTE | [2000/35] | English: | AN APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CHUCKING A CARTRIDGE | [2000/35] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SERRAGE DE CASSETTE DANS UN MANDRIN | [2000/35] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/35] | 18.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0571227 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,10 * column A; figure - * * column 5, line 7 - column 11, line 29 *; | [A]JPH04289573 ; | [A]JPH04318370 ; | [A]US4887174 (TEZUKA NOBUO [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 45; figure - *; | [A]US4509086 (HICKETHIER CRAIG R [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column A; figure - *; | [A]EP0700041 (DISCOVISION ASS [US]) [A] 1,5-8,10 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4866693 (ODAWARA KAZUHARA [JP], et al) [A] 1,5-8,10 * column A; figure - *; | [A]EP0219415 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column A; figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930223), vol. 017, no. 090, Database accession no. (P - 1492), & JP04289573 A 19921014 (SONY CORP) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930324), vol. 017, no. 147, Database accession no. (P - 1508), & JP04318370 A 19921109 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,10 * abstract * |