EP1104528 - PIPE CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/23] | SLEEVE JOINT | ||
[2002/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.2008 | Change - representative | published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pipelife Nederland B.V. P.O. Box 380 1600 AJ Enkhuizen / NL | [2001/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUITONEAU, Hans, Edward Prior 9 NL-1613 DH Grootebroek / NL | [2001/23] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2003/16] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2001/23] | Jorritsma, Ruurd, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99940714.1 | 19.08.1999 | [2001/23] | WO1999NL00522 | Priority number, date | NL19981009898 | 19.08.1998 Original published format: NL 1009898 | [2001/23] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011390 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104528 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104528 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/06, F16L58/18 | [2001/23] | CPC: |
F16L58/18 (EP,US);
F16L21/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRVERBINDUNG | [2002/46] | English: | PIPE CONNECTION | [2002/46] | French: | RACCORD DE TUYAUX | [2002/46] |
Former [2001/23] | MUFFENVERBINDUNG | ||
Former [2001/23] | SLEEVE JOINT | ||
Former [2001/23] | ASSEMBLAGE A MANCHON | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1999 | Translation filed | 14.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.07.2003 | CY | 19.08.2003 | LU | 19.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/39] | GR | 23.07.2003 | |
CY | 19.08.2003 | ||
LU | 19.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | GR | 23.07.2003 | |
CY | 19.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3687487 (LINDHOLM EDWARD J) [Y] 1,3 * column 2, line 32 - line 41; figure - * [A] 2,6-8; | [A]EP0438990 (ALPRENE S A S DI BALDUSSI EZIO [IT]) [A] 4* figure 1 *; | [YD]WO9512086 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [YD] 1,3 * figure 3; claims 1,4,14 * |