EP1105532 - COMPOSITONS, KITS, AND METHODS FOR HYDRODYNAMIC STRESS-RELATED REGULATION OF GENE EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania Center for Technology Transfer 3700 Market Street Suite 300 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF THE UNIVERSITY OF PENNSYLVANIA Center for Technology Transfer, 3700 Market Street, Suite 300 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104-3147 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIES, Peter, F. 519 Mulberry Lane Haverford, PA 19041 / US | 02 /
POLACEK, Denise, C. 216 Indian Creek Road Wynnewood, PA 19096 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99940984.0 | 13.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999US18014 | Priority number, date | US19980096624P | 14.08.1998 Original published format: US 96624 P | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0009750 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105532 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
G01N33/5005 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6809 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6809, C12Q2527/109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, KITS, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HYDRODYNAMISCHEN STRESS-GEKOPPELTEN REGULATION DER GENEXPRESSION | [2001/24] | English: | COMPOSITONS, KITS, AND METHODS FOR HYDRODYNAMIC STRESS-RELATED REGULATION OF GENE EXPRESSION | [2001/24] | French: | COMPOSTIONS, KITS ET PROCEDES POUR LA REGULATION DE L'EXPRESSION GENIQUE LIEE AUX CONTRAINTES HYDRODYNAMIQUES | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 15.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 08.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5498539 (HARRISON DAVID G [US], et al) |