Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4815053B | Global Dossier | 16.11.2011 | B2 | JP2002522473 | 23.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9918552 | 13.08.1999 | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2127642 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2010 | A3 | EP2127642 | 02.12.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | EP99941159 | 13.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5486899 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9918552 | 13.08.1999 | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1104290 | Global Dossier | 31.03.2010 | B1 | EP1104290 | 18.01.2006 | A4 | EP1104290 | 06.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9918552 | 13.08.1999 | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE462417T | 15.04.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9918552 | 13.08.1999 | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2339991 | 02.01.2007 | C | CA2339991 | 24.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9918552 | 13.08.1999 | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69942205D1 | 12.05.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9918552 | 13.08.1999 | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6280770 | 28.08.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | US37439399 | 13.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0009093 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2341510T | 21.06.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US9634798 | 13.08.1998 | Type | Divisional application | EP2127642 |