EP1098728 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GUIDING AND SUPPORTING A THIN SHEET OR METAL STRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag Aktiengesellschaft Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2002/16] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNEPPE, Günter Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 11 D-57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 02 /
MÜNKER, Jochen Ausser dem Schlag 14 D-57223 Kreuztal / DE | 03 /
GRAFE, Horst Talsperrenstrasse 3 D-57271 Hilchenbach / DE | 04 /
SEIDEL, Jürgen Feuerdornweg 8 D-57223 Kreuztal / DE | [2002/07] |
Former [2001/20] | 01 /
KNEPPE, Günter Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 11 D-57271 Hilchenbach / DE | ||
02 /
MÜNKER, Jochen Au er dem Schlag 14 D-57223 Kreuztal / DE | |||
03 /
GRAFE, Horst Talsperrenstrasse 3 D-57271 Hilchenbach / DE | |||
04 /
SEIDEL, Jürgen Feuerdornweg 8 D-57223 Kreuztal / DE | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/07] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte, Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99941440.2 | 17.07.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP05116 | Priority number, date | DE1998132925 | 22.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832925 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0005020 | Date: | 03.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1098728 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1098728 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B23D33/02, B23D25/12 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
B23D25/12 (EP);
B23D33/02 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FÜHREN UND STÜTZEN EINES DÜNNEN BLECHES ODER METALLBANDES | [2001/20] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GUIDING AND SUPPORTING A THIN SHEET OR METAL STRIP | [2001/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR GUIDER ET SOUTENIR UNE FINE TOLE OU UN MINCE RUBAN DE METAL | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 27.02.2002 | IE | 27.02.2002 | DK | 27.05.2002 | PT | 27.05.2002 | LU | 17.07.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | [2013/46] |
Former [2007/04] | GB | 27.02.2002 | |
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
IE | 27.02.2002 | ||
DK | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
LU | 17.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | GB | 27.02.2002 | |
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
DK | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
LU | 17.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2004/10] | GB | 27.02.2002 | |
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
DK | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | GB | 27.02.2002 | |
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
DK | 27.05.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | GB | 27.02.2002 | |
GR | 27.02.2002 | ||
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | GB | 27.02.2002 | |
PT | 27.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | GB | 27.02.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE944919 (JAGENBERG WERKE AG) [X] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 114; figure 1 * [Y] 2,4,5,9-12,14; | [Y]US3143016 (NOEL OBENSHAIN DAVID) [Y] 4,6-8,10 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 63; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JPH0487713 (KAWASAKI STEEL CO) [Y] 6-9,11,12,14* the whole document *; | [Y]US5140880 (LITTLETON FRANCIS J [US]) [Y] 2,5 * column 4, line 34 - column 8, line 6; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE1427231 |