EP1102661 - BELLOWS ACTUATION DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR ROBOTIC MANIPULATOR, AND METHOD TO OPERATE SAID DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arrichiello, Vincenzo Via S.Antonio,7 19121 La Spezia / IT | [2001/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/22] | Application number, filing date | 99941791.8 | 04.08.1999 | [2001/22] | WO1999IB01544 | Priority number, date | IT1998SP00006 | 05.08.1998 Original published format: IT SP980006 | [2001/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0007781 | Date: | 17.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1102661 | Date: | 30.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1102661 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/00, B25J15/02, B25J9/14 | [2001/22] | CPC: |
B25J9/14 (EP,US);
B25J15/0023 (EP,US);
B25J15/0028 (EP,US);
B25J15/0206 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20323 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/22] | Title | German: | BALGENSTELLANTRIEB, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN ROBOTERMANIPULATOR, SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN BETRIEB | [2001/22] | English: | BELLOWS ACTUATION DEVICE, ESPECIALLY FOR ROBOTIC MANIPULATOR, AND METHOD TO OPERATE SAID DEVICE | [2001/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF ACTIONNEUR DE SOUFFLETS, SPECIALEMENT POUR MANIPULATION ROBOTIQUE, ET PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT DUDIT DISPOSITIF | [2001/22] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.1999 | Translation filed | 05.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/22] | 25.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.01.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2004 | BE | 28.01.2004 | CH | 28.01.2004 | CY | 28.01.2004 | FI | 28.01.2004 | LI | 28.01.2004 | NL | 28.01.2004 | DK | 28.04.2004 | GR | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | ES | 09.05.2004 | PT | 28.06.2004 | IE | 04.08.2004 | LU | 04.08.2004 | MC | 31.08.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
LU | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
NL | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
IE | 04.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
MC | 31.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
BE | 28.01.2004 | ||
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
ES | 09.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
CH | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
LI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH08323675 ; | [Y]JPH06190771 ; | [Y]US3981528 (ANDORF PAUL, et al) [Y] 2 * column 6, line 18 - line 36 * * figures 6,7 *; | [Y]US4607998 (HAWKES GRAHAM S [US]) [Y] 16-24* abstract *; | [Y]US4921293 (RUOFF CARL F [US], et al) [Y] 13 * column 5, line 3 - line 6 *; | [Y]US4976191 (SUZUMORI KOICHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * figure 49 *; | [Y]EP0446609 (TOZUKA TADAO [JP]) [Y] 14 * figure 8 *; | [Y]EP0534778 (UNIV BRISTOL [GB]) [Y] 15 * abstract * * column 2, line 53 - line 55 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970430), vol. 1997, no. 04, & JP08323675 A 19961210 (KUBOTA CORP) [X] 1,3,4,6,12 * abstract * [Y] 2,5,7-9,13-24 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941013), vol. 018, no. 538, Database accession no. (M - 1686), & JP06190771 A 19940712 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 7-9 * abstract * |