EP1101087 - FLEXIBLE SILICON STRAIN GAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROSEMOUNT AEROSPACE INC. 143 Judicial Road Burnsville, MN 55306 / US | [2001/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOGGS, Bradley J. Apt. L-23, 7990 Deepwood Boulevard Mentor, OH 44060-7777 / US | 02 /
JUST, Marcus S. Apt. 203, 7010 Carriage Hill Drive Brecksville, OH 44141-1240 / US | 03 /
BANG, Christopher A. 14154 Swan Lake Boulevard North Royalton, OH 44133 / US | 04 /
STARK, Kevin C. 25028 Rushmore Court Richmond Heights, OH 44143-2546 / US | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Howden, Christopher A., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Howden, Christopher Andrew, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99941975.7 | 27.07.1999 | [2001/21] | WO1999US16900 | Priority number, date | US19980094358P | 28.07.1998 Original published format: US 94358 P | US19980105250P | 22.10.1998 Original published format: US 105250 P | US19990245272 | 05.02.1999 Original published format: US 245272 | [2001/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0006983 | Date: | 10.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1101087 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1101087 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/22, G01L1/18, G01L9/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
G01L1/2293 (EP,US);
G01L1/18 (EP,US);
G01L9/0055 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/26] |
Former [2001/21] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER DEHNUNGSMESSSTREIFEN AUS SILIZIUM | [2002/45] | English: | FLEXIBLE SILICON STRAIN GAGE | [2001/21] | French: | JAUGE DYNAMOMETRIQUE EN SILICIUM SOUPLE | [2001/21] |
Former [2001/21] | FLEXIBLER DEHNUNGSMESSTREIFEN AUS SILIZIUM | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 20.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP03008110.3 / EP1335194 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 25.06.2003 | DE | 26.09.2003 | [2006/32] |
Former [2004/23] | DE | 26.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4658233 (UCHIDA YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [DA] 1-51 * the whole document *; | [A]US4422063 (PRYOR ROGER W [US]) [A] 1-51 * the whole document * |