07.07.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] |
30.04.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] |
16.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2004 [2004/23] |
09.05.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.06.2003 [2003/26] |
15.04.2003 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
28.03.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.09.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
21.09.2002 |
Change - German title |
published on 06.11.2002 [2002/45] |
31.07.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.09.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
17.08.2001 |
First examination report |
|
14.08.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
06.04.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |
06.04.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.05.2001 [2001/21] |
16.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|