EP1105460 - DIFFERENTIATION OF NON-INSULIN PRODUCING CELLS INTO INSULIN PRODUCING CELLS BY GLP-1 OR EXENDIN-4 AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [2009/41] |
Former [2001/24] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES c/o National Institutes of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGAN, Josephine 2421 Everton Road Baltimore, MD 21209 / US | 02 /
PERFETTI, Riccardo 1729 Corcoran Street, N.W. Washington, DC 20009 / US | 03 /
PASSANITI, Antonino 18315 Peters Avenue White Hall, MD 21161 / US | 04 /
GREIG, Nigel 14415 Long Green Drive Silver Springs, MD 20906 / US | 05 /
HOLLOWAY, Harold 121 Mariners Point Drive Middle River, MD 21220 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99942066.4 | 10.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999US18099 | Priority number, date | US19980095917P | 10.08.1998 Original published format: US 95917 P | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0009666 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1105460 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105460 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.11.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/06, A61K38/22, A61K38/26, C07K14/605, C07K14/575 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
C12N5/0676 (EP,US);
A61K35/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/26 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/24] | Title | German: | DIFFERENZIERUNG VON NICHT-INSULIN IN INSULIN-PRODUZIERENDE ZELLEN DURCH GLP-1 UND EXENDIN-4 UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [2009/32] | English: | DIFFERENTIATION OF NON-INSULIN PRODUCING CELLS INTO INSULIN PRODUCING CELLS BY GLP-1 OR EXENDIN-4 AND USES THEREOF | [2001/24] | French: | DIFFERENCIATION DES CELLULES NE PRODUISANT PAS D'INSULINE -ELLULES PRODUISANT DE L'INSULINE, DIFFERENCIEES DE CELLULES NE PRODUISANT PAS D'INSULINE, AU MOYEN DE GLP-1 OU D'EXENDINE-4 ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2001/24] |
Former [2001/24] | DIFFERENZIERUNG VON NICHT-INSULIN IN INSULIN-PRODUZIERENDE ZELLEN DURCG GLP-1 UND EXENDIN-4 UND DESSEN VERWENDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 02.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08019260.2 / EP2028269 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.10.2009 | FI | 07.10.2009 | PT | 08.02.2010 | [2012/37] |
Former [2010/28] | FI | 07.10.2009 | |
PT | 08.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5424286 (ENG JOHN [US]) [X] 36 * column A *; | [X]WO9531214 (LONDON HEALTH ASS [CA], et al) [X] 34 * page 1, line 31 - line 34 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 20 * * page 4, line 26 - line 30 *; | [E]WO9943705 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [E] 34* abstract *; | [DXA] - MASHIMA ET AL, "FORMATION OF INSULIN-PRODUCING CELLS FROM PANCREATIC ACINAR AR42J CELLS BY HEPATOCYTE GROWTH FACTOR", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1996), vol. 137, no. 9, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 3969 - 3976, XP000670297 [DX] 31 * abstract * * page 3974, column L * * page 3975, column R * [A] 1,2,4-6,9,12,13,15-17,20,23,25,27,29,32,33 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.137.9.3969 | [A] - GEFEL ET AL, "GLUCAGON-LIKE PEPTIDE-I ANALOGS: EFFECTS ON INSULIN SECRETION AND ADENOSINE 3',5'-MONOPHOSPHATE FORMATION", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1990), vol. 126, no. 4, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 2164 - 2168, XP000574862 | [DA] - THORENS B ET AL, "CLONING AND FUNCTIONAL EXPRESSION OF THE HUMAN ISLET GLP-1 RECEPTORÖDEMONSTRATION THAT EXENDIN-4 IS AN AGONIST AND EXENDIN-(9-39) AN ANTAGONIST OF THE RECEPTOR", DIABETES, (19931101), vol. 42, no. 11, ISSN 0012-1797, pages 1678 - 1682, XP000571435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diabetes.42.11.1678 | Examination | - ZHOU ET AL, "Glucagon-like peptide 1 and Exendin-4 convert pancreatic AR42J clels into glucagon- and insulin-producing cells", DIABETES, (199912), vol. 48, pages 2358 - 2366 |