EP1105669 - PIPE GASKET WITH EMBEDDED RING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.2005 [2005/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S & B Technical Products, Inc. 1300 East Berry Forth Worth, TX 76119 / US | [2001/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORBETT, Bradford, G., Jr. 1300 East Berry Fort Worth, TX 76119 / US | [2001/24] | Representative(s) | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/24] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 99942267.8 | 18.08.1999 | [2001/24] | WO1999US18735 | Priority number, date | US19980140253 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: US 140253 | [2001/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0012926 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1105669 | Date: | 13.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1105669 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L17/02 | [2001/24] | CPC: |
F16L21/03 (EP,US);
Y10S285/91 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/15] |
Former [2001/24] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ROHRDICHTUNG MIT EINGELASSENEM RING | [2001/24] | English: | PIPE GASKET WITH EMBEDDED RING | [2001/24] | French: | GARNITURE POUR TUBES AVEC BAGUE ENCASTREE | [2001/24] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/24] | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4818209 (PETERSSON STEFAN [SE], et al) [A] 1-4,10-12,18 * column 1, line 4 - line 25; figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US4625383 (VASSALLO EFRAIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-4,10-13,19 * column 9, line 24 - line 28; figures 1-9 * | International search | [A]US2955322 (HITE EARL E); | [A]US3776682 (PARMANN G); | [A]US4030872 (PARMANN GUNNAR); | [A]US4061459 (PARMANN GUNNAR); | [A]US4120521 (PARMANN GUNNAR); | [A]US4299412 (PARMANN GUNNAR); | [A]US4368894 (PARMANN GUNNAR [NO]); | [A]US4572523 (GUETTOUCHE ALI [DE], et al); | [A]US4693483 (VALLS JOSE E [US]); | [A]US5213339 (WALWORTH VAN T [US]) | by applicant | US4120521 | US4061459 | US4030872 | US3965715 | US3929958 | US3887992 | US3884612 | US3776682 | US3500047 |