EP1112077 - METHOD FOR DETECTION OF BIOLOGICAL FACTORS IN EPIDERMIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.2011 [2011/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dermtech International 15222-B Avenue of Science San Diego, Ca 92128 / US | [2010/50] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states California Skin Research Institute 15222-B Avenue of Science San Diego, Ca 92128 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RHEINS, Lawrence, A. 165 Calle del Rancho Escondido, CA 92025 / US | 02 /
MORHENN, Vera, B. 1685 Calle Camille La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Wakerley, Helen Rachael Reddie & Grose, 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99942356.9 | 17.08.1999 | [2001/27] | WO1999US19012 | Priority number, date | US19980097025P | 18.08.1998 Original published format: US 97025 P | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010579 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112077 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1112077 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/36, A61K38/20, G01N33/68, C12Q1/68 | [2003/34] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/68 (KR);
A61K49/0006 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | A61K35/36, A61K48/00, A61K49/00, C12Q1/68, C12N15/12, C12N15/19, C12N15/24, C12N15/09, C12N15/10, C12N15/11, C12P19/30, C12P19/34 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE ZUM NACHWEIS BIOLOGISCHER FAKTOREN IN DER EPIDERMIS | [2001/27] | English: | METHOD FOR DETECTION OF BIOLOGICAL FACTORS IN EPIDERMIS | [2001/27] | French: | DETECTION DE FACTEURS BIOLOGIQUES DANS L'EPIDERME | [2001/27] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 10.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - WERFEL ET AL, "Cytokines as mediators of allergic tissue response", ALLERGOLOGIE, DUSTRI VERLAG, MUENCHEN-DEISENHOFEN, DE, (1997), vol. 20, no. 11, ISSN 0344-5062, pages 546 - 550, XP000910521 [X] 8-43 * page 547, column 2 - page 548, column 1 * | [X] - WERFEL T ET AL, "High IL-4 secretion from skin-derived nickel specific T-lymphocytes is associated with atopy and acute eczema are associated with in allergic contact dermatitis.", JOURNAL OF ALLERGY AND CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY, 54th Annual Meeting of the American Academy of Allergy, Asthma and Immunology;Washington, DC, USA; March 13-18, 1998, (199801), vol. 101, no. 1 PART 2, ISSN 0091-6749, page S129, XP009011342 [X] 8-43 * abstract * | [X] - ROWE A ET AL, "Interleukin-4 and the interleukin-4 receptor in allergic contact dermatitis.", CONTACT DERMATITIS, (199801), vol. 38, no. 1, ISSN 0105-1873, pages 36 - 39, XP009011333 [X] 8-43 * page 37, column 1 - page 38, column 2 * | [X] - GRANGSJO A ET AL, "Different pathways in irritant contact eczema? Early differences in the epidermal elemental content and expression of cytokines after application of 2 different irritants.", CONTACT DERMATITIS, (1996), vol. 35, no. 6, ISSN 0105-1873, pages 355 - 360, XP009011332 [X] 8-43 * page 358 * * page 359, column 2 - page 360, column 1 * | [X] - HOWIE SARAH E M ET AL, "Epidermal keratinocyte production of interferon-gamma immunoreactive protein and mRNA is an early event in allergic contact dermatitis.", JOURNAL OF INVESTIGATIVE DERMATOLOGY, (1996), vol. 106, no. 6, ISSN 0022-202X, pages 1218 - 1223, XP009011334 [X] 8-43 * page 1220, column 2 - page 1221, column 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1523-1747.ep12348507 | [X] - BRAND CU AND BRAATHEN LR, "Untersuchung menschlicher Hautlymphe: Unterscheiden sich irritative und allergische Kontaktdermatitiden bezüglich ihres Zytokinmusters?", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR HAUTKRANKHEITEN, (1997), vol. 72, pages 435 - 440, XP009011422 [X] 8-43 * page 436, column 1 - page 437, column 2 * | [X] - KONING H ET AL, "T cell subsets and cytokines in allergic and non-allergic children. I. Analysis of IL-4, IFN-gamma and IL-13 mRNA expression and protein production.", CYTOKINE, (1997), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1043-4666, pages 416 - 426, XP002242623 [X] 44-50 * page 423, column 1, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cyto.1996.0184 | International search | [A]US4537776 (COOPER EUGENE R [US]); | [A]US4971800 (CHESS SAMUEL [US], et al); | [A]US5460939 (NAUGHTON BRIAN A [US], et al); | [A]US5753612 (MITRANI EDUARDO [US]) | by applicant | US4458066 | US4683202 | US4683195 | - SAIKI ET AL., BIOLTECHNOLOGY, (1985), vol. 3, pages 1008 - 1012 | - CONNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1983), vol. 80, page 278 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, page 1077 | - LANDEGREN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 229 - 237 |