EP1099290 - INTEGRATED MODE CONTROL FOR MICROPOWER SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Satcon Technology Corporation 161 First Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2003/01] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East, M/S 90/110/CC Los Angeles, California 90067-2199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNDERWOOD, Thomas, C. 9394 Steeple Court Laurel, MD 20723-5826 / US | 02 /
HALL, William, B. 1095 River Bay Road Annapolis, MD 21401 / US | 03 /
MATTY, Thomas, C. 2400 Robbins Station Rd. North Huntingdon, PA 15642 / US | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys., et al PRÜFER & PARTNER, Patentanwälte, Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99942493.0 | 26.08.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999US19511 | Priority number, date | US19980140391 | 26.08.1998 Original published format: US 140391 | [2001/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0013285 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1099290 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099290 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/38 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
H02J3/38 (EP,US);
H02J3/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTE MODUS-STEUERUNG FÜR STROMVERSORGUNG MIT KLEINER LEISTUNG | [2001/20] | English: | INTEGRATED MODE CONTROL FOR MICROPOWER SYSTEMS | [2001/20] | French: | COMMANDE INTEGREE DE MODES POUR SYSTEMES DE GENERATION DE MICROCOURANT | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 12.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.2001 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2003 | FI | 23.04.2003 | IT | 23.04.2003 | NL | 23.04.2003 | DK | 23.07.2003 | GR | 23.07.2003 | PT | 23.07.2003 | SE | 23.07.2003 | CY | 26.08.2003 | MC | 31.08.2003 | ES | 30.10.2003 | [2008/18] |
Former [2005/02] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 26.08.2003 | ||
MC | 31.08.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
CY | 26.08.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
DK | 23.07.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
FI | 23.04.2003 | ||
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
ES | 30.10.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 23.04.2003 | |
NL | 23.04.2003 | ||
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 23.04.2003 | |
GR | 23.07.2003 | ||
PT | 23.07.2003 | ||
SE | 23.07.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | SE | 23.07.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63234879 ; | [A]JPH07245876 ; | [A]JPH09201070 ; | [A]JPH07336898 ; | [A]US5015941 (DHYANCHAND P JOHN [US]) [A] 1,10 * column 3, line 11 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0570976 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 19,25 * column 9, line 25 - column 16, line 34; figures 1-7 *; | [A]US5369353 (ERDMAN WILLIAM L [US]) [A] 14-16,18 * column 4, line 5 - column 11, line 22; figures 1-7 *; | [A]WO9825014 (ELLIOTT ENERGY SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [A] 1,7,10 * page 6, line 7 - page 13, line 34; figures 1-7 *; | [DA]US5773955 (HALL WILLIAM B [US]) [DA] 14,17,18 * column 2, line 20 - column 5, line 38; figures 4-6 *; | [A] - TORIGOE S ET AL, "COGENERATION SYSTEMS USING A DIESEL ENGINE-GENERATOR FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS POWER PLANTS", INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE. (INTELEC),US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. CONF. 15, pages 274-279 - 279, XP000496154 [A] * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890127), vol. 13, no. 38, Database accession no. (E - 709), & JP63234879 A 19880930 (HITACHI) [A] 19,20,22,25,26,28 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 1996, no. 1, & JP07245876 A 19950919 (TOSHIBA) [A] 19,20,22,23,25,26,28,29 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 1997, no. 11, & JP09201070 A 19970731 (TOSHIBA) [A] 30,35 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960430), vol. 1996, no. 4, & JP07336898 A 19951222 (NISSIN ELECTRIC) [A] 30 * abstract * |