EP1068370 - MULTI-LEDGE SUBSTRATE SUPPORT FOR A THERMAL PROCESSING CHAMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | For all designated states APPLIED MATERIALS, INC. 3050 Bowers Avenue, M/S 2061 Santa Clara, California 95054-3299 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEATON, Paul 4471 Venice Way San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Meredith, J. P.O. Box 5654 Santa Clara, CA 95056 / US | [2001/03] | Representative(s) | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/03] | Bayliss, Geoffrey Cyril, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 99942616.6 | 23.02.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999US03927 | Priority number, date | US19980053286 | 01.04.1998 Original published format: US 53286 | [2001/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9950473 | Date: | 07.10.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068370 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/00, C03C23/00, B08B5/00, B08B7/00, C23F1/02 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
C23C16/4583 (EP,US);
C23C16/4585 (KR);
C23C16/4405 (EP,KR,US);
C23C16/4584 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IE, NL [2001/03] | Title | German: | SUBSTRATTRÄGER MIT VIELEN LEISTEN FÜR EINE THERMISCHE BEHANDLUNGSKAMMER | [2001/03] | English: | MULTI-LEDGE SUBSTRATE SUPPORT FOR A THERMAL PROCESSING CHAMBER | [2001/03] | French: | SUPPORT DE SUBSTRAT MULTI-REBORDS POUR CHAMBRE DE TRAITEMENT THERMIQUE | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.10.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.10.2000 | Search fee paid | 23.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.10.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 01.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 05.11.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 29.02.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3436255 (HARRIS DARREL M, et al); | [A]US4365588 (JOLLY STUART T); | [A]US4978567 (MILLER MICHAEL B [US]); | [X]US5584936 (PICKERING MICHAEL A [US], et al); | [Y]US5616208 (LEE HIDEKI [JP]); | [Y]US5637153 (NIINO REIJI [US], et al); | [Y]US5660472 (PEUSE BRUCE W [US], et al); | [Y]US5671119 (HUANG YUAN-CHANG [TW], et al); | [YP]US5871588 (MOSLEHI MEHRDAD M [US], et al) |