EP1086585 - SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY FOR TRACING TO A SOURCE OF UNAUTHORIZED COPYING OF PRERECORDED PROPRIETARY MATERIAL, SUCH AS MOVIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | For all designated states Google, Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2001/13] | For all designated states Digital Video Express, L.P. 580 Herndon Parkway Herndon, Virginia 20170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHUMANN, Robert, W. 11723 Quay Road Oakton, VA 22124 / US | 02 /
IU, Siu-Leong 1211 Garbo Way, Apt. 305 San Jose, CA 95117 / US | 03 /
BUGWADIA, Kobad 831 Upton Way San José, CA 95136 / US | 04 /
MERCIER, Guillaume Apartment 437, 1504 Lincoln Way McLean, VA 22102 / US | 05 /
RAMADOSS, Shiva Apartment 437, 1504 Lincoln Way McLean, VA 22102 / US | 06 /
BERGERON, Michael 15150 Whispering Springs Lane Montpelier, VA 23192 / US | 07 /
EHRHARDT, Jack 7520 Century Drive Richmond, VA 23229-4935 / US | [2001/32] |
Former [2001/28] | 01 /
SCHUMANN, Robert, W. 11723 Quay Road Oakton, VA 22124 / US | ||
02 /
IU, Siu-Leong 2252 Pimmit Run Lane 202 Falls Church, VA 22043 / US | |||
03 /
BUGWADIA, Kobad 831 Upton Way San José, CA 95136 / US | |||
04 /
MERCIER, Guillaume Apartment 437, 1504 Lincoln Way McLean, VA 22102 / US | |||
05 /
RAMADOSS, Shiva Apartment 437, 1504 Lincoln Way McLean, VA 22102 / US | |||
06 /
BERGERON, Michael 15150 Whispering Springs Lane Montpelier, VA 23192 / US | |||
07 /
EHRHARDT, Jack 7520 Century Drive Richmond, VA 23229-4935 / US | |||
Former [2001/13] | 01 /
SCHUMANN, Robert, W. 11723 Quay Road Oakton, VA 22124 / US | ||
02 /
IU, Siu-Leong 2252 Pimmit Run Lane 202 Falls Church, VA 22043 / US | |||
03 /
BUGWADIA, Kobad 46229 Trillum Square 101 Sterling, VA 20165 / US | |||
04 /
MERCIER, Guillaume Apartment 437, 1504 Lincoln Way McLean, VA 22102 / US | |||
05 /
RAMADOSS, Shiva Apartment 437, 1504 Lincoln Way McLean, VA 22102 / US | |||
06 /
BERGERON, Michael 15150 Whispering Springs Lane Montpelier, VA 23192 / US | |||
07 /
EHRHARDT, Jack 7520 Century Drive Richmond, VA 23229-4935 / US | Representative(s) | Rickard, David John, et al Ipulse Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/47] | Hill, Justin John, et al Ipulse (IP) Ltd. Carrington House 126-130 Regent Street London W1B 5SE / GB | ||
Former [2012/38] | Schley, Jan Malte, et al Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Str. 8 80807 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/27] | Hill, Justin John, et al IPULSE 9-10 Savile Row London, W1S 3PF / GB | ||
Former [2009/24] | Hill, Justin John McDermott Will & Emery UK LLP 7 Bishopsgate London EC2N 3AR / GB | ||
Former [2006/46] | Main, Malcolm Charles, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2001/13] | McNally, Roisin, et al Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99942642.2 | 07.06.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999US11797 | Priority number, date | US19980092898 | 08.06.1998 Original published format: US 92898 | [2001/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9965241 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086585 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/913 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
H04N5/913 (EP,US);
H04N19/00 (EP,US);
H04N2005/91335 (EP,US);
H04N9/8227 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/13] | Extension states | AL | 05.01.2001 | LT | 05.01.2001 | LV | 05.01.2001 | MK | 05.01.2001 | RO | 05.01.2001 | SI | 05.01.2001 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM SUCHEN EINER QUELLE ZUM UNERLAUBTEN KOPIEREN VON VORHERAUFGENOMMENEM EIGENTUMSMATERIAL, WIE FILME | [2001/13] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODOLOGY FOR TRACING TO A SOURCE OF UNAUTHORIZED COPYING OF PRERECORDED PROPRIETARY MATERIAL, SUCH AS MOVIES | [2001/13] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODOLOGIE PERMETTANT DE REMONTER A LA SOURCE DE COPIES NON AUTORISEES DE DOCUMENTS PROTEGES PREENREGISTREES TELS QUE DES FILMS | [2001/13] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 21.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.06.2012 | 26.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.12.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 06.12.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/26] | 13.02.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.08.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 18.08.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 11.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 11.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0107567 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [A] 1-3,16,18,31,36,37* page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 21; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9606503 (MACROVISION CORP [US]) [A] 1-3,16-18,31,33,34,36,37 * page 3, line 10 - page 7, line 12 * * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 8; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9713248 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1,3,4,16,31,36-39 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9803014 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-3,5,12,16,17,19,25,31,36-38 * the whole document * |