EP1131583 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HEATING AND/OR VENTILATING A ROOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Häusler, Peter Münchhaldenstrasse 15 8008 Zürich / CH | [2001/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/37] | Representative(s) | Wenger, René, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Wenger, René, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 99942692.7 | 17.09.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999CH00445 | Priority number, date | CH19980002325 | 20.11.1998 Original published format: CH 232598 | [2001/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031473 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131583 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1131583 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F24D12/02, F24F12/00, F28D20/00 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
F28F7/02 (EP);
F28D20/0056 (EP);
F28D21/0014 (EP);
F28D7/0025 (EP);
F28D7/0066 (EP);
F28D7/0083 (EP);
F28F1/045 (EP);
F24F12/001 (EP);
Y02B30/56 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/37] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM HEIZEN UND/ODER LÜFTEN EINES RAUMES | [2001/37] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HEATING AND/OR VENTILATING A ROOM | [2001/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR CHAUFFER ET/OU AERER UNE PIECE | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.04.2004 | ES | 14.04.2004 | FI | 14.04.2004 | FR | 14.04.2004 | GB | 14.04.2004 | IE | 14.04.2004 | IT | 14.04.2004 | NL | 14.04.2004 | DK | 14.07.2004 | GR | 14.07.2004 | SE | 14.07.2004 | PT | 14.09.2004 | LU | 17.09.2004 | BE | 30.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | CY | 14.04.2004 | |
ES | 14.04.2004 | ||
FI | 14.04.2004 | ||
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
LU | 17.09.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
FR | 14.04.2004 | ||
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
NL | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
BE | 30.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
IE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
DK | 14.07.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.07.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 14.04.2004 | |
GB | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | GB | 14.04.2004 | |
SE | 14.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 14.07.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US1525199 (REES LAFAYETTE J) [A] 3,4* the whole document *; | [XA]DE3244373 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,14-16 * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 9; figure . * [A] 3; | [YA]FR2521698 (SCORDINO HUBERT [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5,7,14-16 * page 3, line 20 - page 6; figure - * [A] 8,10,11,17; | [XY]FR2525746 (VAILLANT SARL [FR]) [X] 1,2,7,14-16 * page 2, line 38 - page 7, line 24; figure 2 * [Y] 8-12,17,18; | NL8301468 [ ] (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO) [ ] * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2136107 (VLIET CORS VAN) [A] 1,2,5,7,14,15 * page 1, line 88 - page 2, line 16; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0284342 (COPERMILL LTD [GB]) [Y] 8-12,17,18 * column 2, line 15 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-5 *; | [DY]GB2220475 (JOHNSON & STARLEY LTD [GB]) [DY] 1,2,5,7,14-16 * page 7, paragraph L - page 9, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [XA] - "ENERGIEZUINIG BOUWEN MET BEHULP VAN DE DRU-ENERGIESCHACHT", KLIMAAT BEHEERSING,NL,C.MISSET B.V. DOETINCHEM, vol. 15, no. 8, page 276-278, XP002067964 [X] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5,7,14 | Examination | DE3308700 |