EP1095321 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DESIGNING THE CONTROL OF AN OVERALL PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2004 [2004/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDIN, Bertil Baumstrasse 11 D-80469 München / DE | 02 /
KALTENBACH, Markus Konradstrasse 10A D-80801 München / DE | [2001/18] | Application number, filing date | 99942734.7 | 01.07.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999DE01915 | Priority number, date | DE1998129804 | 03.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19829804 | [2001/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0002107 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1095321 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1095321 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G05B19/042 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G05B19/0426 (EP,US);
G05B19/056 (EP,US);
G05B19/418 (KR);
G05B19/41885 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2003/23] |
Former [2001/18] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM ENTWURF EINER STEUERUNG FÜR EINEN GESAMTPROZESS | [2001/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DESIGNING THE CONTROL OF AN OVERALL PROCESS | [2001/18] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR ETABLIR UN PROJET DE COMMANDE POUR UN PROCESSUS ENTIER | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 03.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5212881 (NISHITSUKA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract *; | [XYA] - DESPANG H G ET AL, "RECHNERGESTUETZTER ENTWURF VON AUTOMATISIERUNGSANLAGEN UNTER NUTZUNG VON PETRI-NETZEN AM BEISPIEL EINER PAKETVERTEILANLAGE. ÖCAD OF CONTROL SYSTEMS USING PETRI NETS FOR THE EXAMPLE OF A PARCEL DISTRIBUTOR IN A POST OFFICE", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNIK - AT,DE,OLDENBOURG VERLAG. MUNCHEN, vol. 41, no. 8, ISSN 0178-2312, page 307-316, XP000393035 [X] 1-4,7,8 * the whole document * [Y] 6 [A] 5 | [X] - FRIEDRICH A, "NETZ DER NETZE WIE SPS-ORIENTIERTE PETRINETZE DIE TRANSPARENZ VON PROZESSEN ERHOEHEN KOENNEN", ELEKTROTECHNIK,DE,VOGEL VERLAG K.G. WURZBURG, vol. 76, no. 4, ISSN 1431-9578, page 44-47, XP000447796 [X] 1,3,7,8 * the whole document * | [X] - JÖRG SCHNEIDER, FEHLERREAKTION MIT SPEICHERPROGRAMMIERBAREN STEUERUNGEN-EIN BEITRAG ZUR FEHLERTOLERANZ, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), 99, XP002126582 [X] 1,3,7,8 * page 103, column R, paragraph 1 - page 108, column L, paragraph L * | [X] - FLECKENSTEIN J., ZUSTANDSGRAPHEN FÜR SPS-GRAPHIKUNTERSTÜTZENDE PROGRAMMIERUNG UND STEUERUNGSABHÄNGIGE DARSTELLUNG, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1997), 63, XP002126583 [X] 1,3,7,8 * page 34, paragraph 3 - page 41, paragraph L * | Examination | DE19639424 |