EP1097522 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ELECTROTECHNICAL OR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND DEVICES VIA TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORKS, NOTABLY PUBLIC WIRELESS CELLULAR NETWORKS OR LOCAL DECT-STANDARD RADIO COMMUNICATION CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2003 [2003/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRES, Thomas Sulzbacher Strasse 6 D-80803 München / DE | [2001/19] | Application number, filing date | 99942769.3 | 01.07.1999 | [2001/19] | WO1999DE01961 | Priority number, date | DE1998132070 | 16.07.1998 Original published format: DE 19832070 | [2001/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0004523 | Date: | 27.01.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1097522 | Date: | 09.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04B3/54, H04M11/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
H04M11/04 (EP);
H04M11/007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2001/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM STEUERN VON ELEKTROTECHNISCHEN ODER ELEKTRONISCHEN GERÄTEN UND EINRICHTUNGEN ÜBER TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZE | [2001/19] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ELECTROTECHNICAL OR ELECTRONIC APPARATUS AND DEVICES VIA TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORKS, NOTABLY PUBLIC WIRELESS CELLULAR NETWORKS OR LOCAL DECT-STANDARD RADIO COMMUNICATION CHANNELS | [2001/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER DES APPAREILS ET DES DISPOSITIFS ELECTROTECHNIQUES OU ELECTRONIQUES PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE DE RESEAUX DE TELECOMMUNICATION, EN PARTICULIER DE RESEAUX MOBILES CELLULAIRES SANS FIL PUBLICS OU DE CANAUX RADIO A LA NORME DECT | [2001/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/19] | 01.02.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/36] | 11.03.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2002 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]EP0837589 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [Y] 1 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 24 * * column 4, line 27 - line 43 * * column 5, line 9 - column 7, line 15 * * claims 1-5,9 * [A] 2; | [YA]EP0714193 (PLESSEY TELECOMM) [Y] 1 * the whole document * [A] 3-8; | [A]US5051720 (KITTIRUTSUNETORN KITTI) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4386436 (KOCHER CHRISTOPHER P ET AL) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 23 - line 36 * |