EP1107667 - HERBICIDAL AGENTS FOR TOLERANT OR RESISTANT SOYBEAN CROPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [2022/40] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience AG Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states Aventis CropScience GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACKER, Erwin Margarethenstrasse 16 D-65239 Hochheim / DE | 02 /
BIERINGER, Hermann Eichenweg 26 D-65817 Eppstein / DE | 03 /
WILLMS, Lothar Königsteiner Strasse 50 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Düsseldorf Mönchenwerther Straße 11 40545 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/40] |
Former [2012/38] | von Renesse, Dorothea, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2011/43] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2009/01] | Von Renesse, Dorothea, et al König Szynka Tilmann von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Lohengrinstrasse 11 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99942831.1 | 10.08.1999 | [2001/25] | WO1999EP05794 | Priority number, date | DE19981036660 | 13.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19836660 | [2001/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0008934 | Date: | 24.02.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1107667 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1107667 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/41] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1107667 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | [2011/51] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1107667 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A01N57/20, // (A01N57/20, 47:38, 47:36, 47:30, 43:90, 43:88, 43:76, 43:653, 43:50, 43:40, 43:10, 37:48, 37:38, 37:22), A01N33:18 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
A01N57/20 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N57/20, A01N2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/25] | A01N57/20, // (A01N57/20, 47:38, 47:36, 47:30, 43:90, 43:88, 43:76, 43:653, 43:50, 43:40, 43:10, 37:48, 37:38, 37:22), A01N33:18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2022/40] |
Former [2001/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | HERBIZIDE MITTEL FÜR TOLERANTE ODER RESISTENTE SOJAKULTUREN | [2001/25] | English: | HERBICIDAL AGENTS FOR TOLERANT OR RESISTANT SOYBEAN CROPS | [2001/25] | French: | HERBICIDES POUR CULTURES DE SOJA TOLERANTES OU RESISTANTES | [2001/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 23.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.01.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.04.2011 | 05.04.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10010525.3 / EP2329718 | EP10010526.1 / EP2327305 | EP10010527.9 / EP2329719 | EP15000668.2 / EP2904902 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2002 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
12.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Dow Agrosciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road INDIANAPOLIS IN 46268-1054 / US Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | 02
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Syngenta Crop Protection AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative SYNGENTA IP WRO B8-Z1-30 Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2019/46] |
Former [2016/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
12.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Dow Agrosciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road INDIANAPOLIS IN 46268-1054 / US Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | ||
02
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative BASF IP Association BASF SE ZRX-C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Syngenta International AG WRO-1008-Z1-26 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2014/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
12.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Dow Agrosciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road INDIANAPOLIS IN 46268-1054 / US Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | ||
02
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Schultz, Hanna G. A. BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Syngenta International AG WRO-1008.Z1.26 Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2012/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
12.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Dow Agrosciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road INDIANAPOLIS IN 46268-1054 / US Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | ||
02
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Schultz, Hanna G. A. BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03
11.07.2012
17.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Radkov, Stoyan Atanassov Syngenta International AG IP Patent Department Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | |||
Former [2012/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2012
12.07.2012
ADMISSIBLE Dow Agrosciences LLC 9330 Zionsville Road INDIANAPOLIS IN 46268-1054 / US Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bird & Bird Pacellistrasse 14 80333 München / DE | ||
02
11.07.2012
BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE Opponent's representative Schultz, Hanna G. A. BASF SE Global Intellectual Property GVX - C6 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
03
11.07.2012
Syngenta Crop Protection AG Schwarzwaldallee 215 4058 Basel / CH | 22.08.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.07.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.02.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 19.01.2022 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.01.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 26.08.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 11.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T0919/15 | 09.07.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 06.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T0919/15 | 08.07.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 22.04.2015 | Appeal received No. T0919/15 | 01.07.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.07.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2019 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 18.11.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 18.11.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.11.2002 | Decision despatched | 09.11.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | IE | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | GR | 13.01.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | LU | 10.08.2012 | AT | 31.08.2012 | BE | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | GB | 09.08.2019 | ES | 11.08.2019 | [2022/23] |
Former [2020/03] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
LU | 10.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
GB | 09.08.2019 | ||
Former [2014/27] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
LU | 10.08.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
AT | 31.08.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
BE | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 12.10.2011 | |
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 12.10.2011 | |
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9505082 (HOECHST SCHERING AGREVO GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 9,10 * page 1 - page 2 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3; claim - *; | [X]WO9632013 (CIBA GEIGY [CH], et al) [X] 1-7 * page 1 - page 10, paragraph 2 * * page 13 - page 14, line 4; claims 1,7-9,14-17 *; | [Y]WO9736488 (MONSANTO EUROPE SA [BE], et al) [Y] 9,10 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 3; example 10; claim - *; | [DXY]WO9809525 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DX] 1-8 * page 1 - page 3, paragraph 4 * * page 9, paragraph 1; claims 1,5,6 * [Y] 1-10; | [Y] - HARVEY R G ET AL, "Soybean herbicide studies.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1995), Database accession no. 1995-89213, URL: STN, XP002127235 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (51, 338-43, 1994) 1 TAB., Univ.Wisconsin | [Y] - HARVEY R G ET AL, "Soybean herbicide studies.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1996), Database accession no. 1996-90386, URL: STN, XP002127236 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (52, 316-20, 1995) 1 TAB., Univ.Wisconsin | [Y] - HOVERSTAD T R ET AL, "Herbicide performance in soybeans at Waseca, MN in 1997.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1998), Database accession no. 1998-89754, URL: STN, XP002127237 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (54, 408-409, 1997) 1 TAB. | [Y] - SINZAR, BORIVOJE ET AL, "Efficacy of herbicides in soybean crop in southern Banat", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950911), vol. 123, no. 11, Database accession no. 135804, XP002127232 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - BEDMAR, FRANCISCO, "Bermudagrass (Cynodon dactylon) control in sunflower (Helianthus annuus), soybean ( Glycine max), and potato (Solanum tuberosum) with postemergence graminicides", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19980216), vol. 128, no. 7, Database accession no. 71922, XP002127233 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - MOSELEY, CARROLL M. ET AL, "Reducing herbicide inputs when establishing no-till soybeans (Glycine max)", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900813), vol. 113, no. 7, Database accession no. 54241, XP002127234 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - WEED TECHNOL. (1990), 4(1), 14-19 | [Y] - C TOMLIN (ED), The Pesticide Manual, Tenth Edition, FARNHAM, GB, ISBN 0-948404-79-5, XP002099499 [Y] 1-8 * page 1335 - page 1341 * | [X] - STECKEL G J ET AL, "Weed control in glufosinate tolerant soybeans, Urbana, Illinois, 1995.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1996), Database accession no. 1996-90678, URL: STN, XP002127238 [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (52, 336-38, 1995) 2 TAB., Univ.Illinois | [X] - JOHNSON W G ET AL, "Weed control programs in glufosinate-tolerant soybean, Columbia, Missouri, 1997.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1998), Database accession no. 1998-88956, URL: STN, XP002127239 [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (54, 234-35, 1997) 1 TAB., Univ.Missouri | [X] - KAPUSTA G ET AL, "Weed control in glufosinate-resistant soybean with glufosinate, flumiclorac, and V-53482 combinations.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1998), Database accession no. 1998-88957, URL: STN, XP002127240 [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (54, 236-37, 1997) 2 TAB., Univ.Southern-Illinois | [X] - ANDERSON D D ET AL, "Glufosinate efficacy in transgenic soybeans at Lincoln, NE in 1995.", CROPU, Derwent Interantional, (1996), Database accession no. 1996-90692, URL: STN, XP002127241 [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (52, 360-61, 1995) 1 TAB. | [X] - KLAUZER J C ET AL, "1996 Glufosinate/ soybean ( Glycine max) field trials update.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1997), Database accession no. 1997-87701, URL: STN, XP002127242 [X] 1,2,4-8 * abstract * | [ ] - PROC.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (51, 138-39, 1996), AgrEvo | [X] - LUESCHEN W E ET AL, "Weed control with postemergence glyphosate in soybeans at Lamberton, MN in 1994.", CROPU, Derwent International, (1995), Database accession no. 1995-88943, URL: STN, XP002127128 [X] 1,3-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (51,268-69, 1995) 1 TAB., Univ.Minnesota | [X] - MCNAMARA J W ET AL, "Weed control with glyphosate in transgenic soybeans.", CROPU, Derwent Interataional, (1997), Database accession no. 1997-88300, URL: STN, XP002127243 [X] 1,3-8 * abstract * | [ ] - RES.REP.NORTH CENT.WEED SCI.SOC. (53, 288-90, 1996) 1 TAB., Univ.Nebraska | Examination | WO9945781 | Opposition | - ''Weed control systems in glyphosate and glufosinate resistant soybeans"; M L. Buesihger et al, NCWSS Research Report, 1997, 54, Seiten 218-219 |