Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1114277
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
16.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
02.04.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
15.04.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
29.03.2003 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
20.11.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.07.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.09.2002 [2002/36] |
24.05.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] |
24.05.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.07.2001 [2001/28] |
20.03.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|