Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002524824 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU755274C | Global Dossier | 21.08.2003 | C | AU755274B | 05.12.2002 | B2 | AU5637299 | 27.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1114277 | Global Dossier | 28.05.2003 | B1 | EP1114277 | 11.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE241777T | 15.06.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2339603 | 19.06.2007 | C | CA2339603 | 16.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69908385T | 18.12.2003 | T2 | DE69908385D1 | 03.07.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1114277T | 15.09.2003 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO20011093L | 02.03.2001 | L | NO20011093D0 | 02.03.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ509614 | 26.11.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL193357B | 28.02.2007 | B1 | PL346428 | 11.02.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | GB9902880 | 01.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0014448 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1104587C | 02.04.2003 | C | CN1316045 | 03.10.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ298480 | 17.10.2007 | B6 | CZ2001780 | 13.06.2001 | A3 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2198148T | 16.01.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB9819196D0 | 28.10.1998 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY121363 | 28.01.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1114277E | 30.09.2003 | E | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2001109267 | 10.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR200100598T | 23.07.2001 | T2 | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWM252869U | 11.12.2004 | U | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200101685 | 28.05.2002 | B | Priority number | Date | GB9819196 | 04.09.1998 |