EP1137041 - ELECTRON BEAM DEVICE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHARGING-SUPPRESSING MEMBER USED IN THE ELECTRON BEAM DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2011/14] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSAKA, Yoko c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 02 /
FUSHIMI, Masahiro c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | 03 /
MITSUTAKE, Hideaki c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146-8501 / JP | [2011/13] |
Former [2001/39] | 01 /
KOSAKA, Yoko 22-6, Nurumizu-nishi 1-chome Atsugi-shi, Kanagawa 243-0033 / JP | ||
02 /
FUSHIMI, Masahiro 350-26, Shindenjuku Zama-shi, Kanagawa 228-0026 / JP | |||
03 /
MITSUTAKE, Hideaki 37-3-303, Katsuradai 2-chome, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 227-0034 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/39] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99943214.9 | 08.09.1999 | [2001/39] | WO1999JP04872 | Priority number, date | JP19980254343 | 08.09.1998 Original published format: JP 25434398 | JP19980285763 | 07.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28576398 | [2001/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014764 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1137041 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1137041 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/12, H01J29/87, H01J9/24 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
H01J29/028 (EP,US);
H01J29/864 (EP,US);
H01J31/127 (EP,US);
H01J2201/3165 (EP,US);
H01J2329/863 (EP,US);
H01J2329/8635 (EP,US);
H01J2329/864 (EP,US);
H01J2329/8645 (EP,US);
H01J2329/8655 (EP,US);
H01J2329/866 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2010/46] |
Former [2001/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRONENSTRAHLGERÄT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LADUNGSUNTERDRÜCKENDEN ELEMENTS FÜR DIE VERWENDUNG IM GENANNTEN GERÄT UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2001/39] | English: | ELECTRON BEAM DEVICE, METHOD FOR PRODUCING CHARGING-SUPPRESSING MEMBER USED IN THE ELECTRON BEAM DEVICE, AND IMAGE FORMING DEVICE | [2001/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF A FAISCEAU ELECTRONIQUE, PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE UN ELEMENT SUPPRESSEUR DE CHARGE DANS LEDIT DISPOSITIF, ET DISPOSITIF D'IMAGERIE | [2001/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2001 | Translation filed | 06.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | [2014/32] |
Former [2012/02] | NL | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS55148350 ; | [X]WO9602933 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 51,53 * page 3, line 10 - line 20; figure 5 * * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 5 *; | [X]US5690530 (JIN SUNGHO [US], et al) [X] 51 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 27 *; | [X]EP0810626 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 51 * column 5, line 40 - line 45 *; | [A]EP0851458 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,52 * page 12, line 35 - line 45 *; | [A]US5227691 (MURAI RYUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,52 * column 10; figure 12 *; | [A]WO9616429 (SILICON VIDEO CORP [US], et al) [A] 1,2,52 * abstract *; | [A]US5371433 (HORNE REMKO [NL], et al) [A] 51,53 * column 1, line 30 - line 50 * * column 5, line 20 - line 25; figure 11 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810204), vol. 005, no. 019, Database accession no. (E - 044), & JP55148350 A 19801118 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1,2,52 * abstract * | International search | [XP]JPH10283945 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH0349135 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | JPS55148350 | EP0851458 |