EP1120787 - INFORMATION RECORDING METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Hideo 205, High-Home-Takahatafudo 890-1, Arai Hino-shi Tokyo 191-0022 / JP | 02 /
ITO, Seigo 36-5-1009, Tsurumichuo 4-chome Tsurumi-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 230-0051 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Hideki 4-11-39-210, Asahicho Kashiwa-shi Chiba 277-0852 / JP | 04 /
UNNO, Hiroaki 1-20-9, Yawata Ichikawa-shi Chiba 272-0021 / JP | 05 /
SOGABE, Hideki 2-31-21-203, Kamishakujii Nerima-ku Tokyo 177-0044 / JP | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99943406.1 | 20.09.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999JP05096 | Priority number, date | JP19980265270 | 18.09.1998 Original published format: JP 26527098 | JP19980292819 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 29281998 | JP19980292821 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 29282198 | JP19980292823 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 29282398 | JP19980292826 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 29282698 | JP19980292827 | 30.09.1998 Original published format: JP 29282798 | [2001/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017874 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1120787 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/12, G11B27/00, G06F12/00, G11B27/034 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
G11B20/1883 (EP,US);
G11B27/034 (EP,US);
G11B27/329 (EP,US);
G11B2220/20 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2575 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | G11B20/12, G11B27/00, G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/31] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN, INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSAUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM | [2001/31] | English: | INFORMATION RECORDING METHOD, INFORMATION RECORDING DEVICE, AND INFORMATION RECORDING MEDIUM | [2001/31] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS, DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2000 | Translation filed | 11.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Search fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 12.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/39] | Divisional application(s) | EP10158281.5 / EP2200032 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5237553 (FUKUSHIMA YOSHIHISA [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,20 * column 1 - column 3 *; | [X]EP0795813 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,20 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9814938 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,20; | [A]EP0837472 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-3,20 * column 2, lines 5-51; figures 1a,b ** column 3, lines 50-55 *; | [PX]EP0866456 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP [JP]) [PX] 1-3,20 * column 10, line 30 - column 14, line 5; figures 9-13 * | International search | [Y]JPS61260339 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH01184763 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JPH025150 (NEC CORP, et al); | [X]JPH04219836 (NEC CORP); | [A]JPH07226902 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [X]EP0709843 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [X]GB2312059 (SONY UK LTD [GB]); | [XP]JPH11162119 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [AP]JPH11250587 (LG ELECTRONICS INC); | [AE]JPH11296999 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) |