EP1104252 - NO-SPILL DRINKING CUP APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2012 | Revocation of patent | published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hakim, Nouri E. 3030 Aurora Street Monroe, LA 71201 / US | [2001/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/23] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/23] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99943860.9 | 20.08.1999 | [2001/23] | WO1999US19238 | Priority number, date | US19980138588 | 21.08.1998 Original published format: US 138588 | US19990271779 | 18.03.1999 Original published format: US 271779 | [2001/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010434 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1104252 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1104252 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47G19/22 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
A47G19/2272 (EP,US);
B65D43/0231 (EP,US);
B65D47/2031 (EP,US);
B65D51/16 (US);
B65D51/165 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00046 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00351 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/23] | A47F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUSLAUFGESCHÜTZTES TRINKBECHER | [2001/23] | English: | NO-SPILL DRINKING CUP APPARATUS | [2001/23] | French: | RECIPIENT A BOIRE ANTIFUITE | [2001/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/23] | 05.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06009518.9 / EP1714592 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2007
13.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Koninklije Philip Electronics N.V. (NL)/ Avent Limited (GB) Groenewoudseweg 1/ Oakleigh Road South 5621 BA Eindhoven/London N11 1SS / NL Opponent's representative de Haan, Poul Erik, et al, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.02.2007
13.03.2007
ADMISSIBLE Koninklije Philip Electronics N.V. (NL)/ Avent Limited (GB) Groenewoudseweg 1/ Oakleigh Road South 5621 BA Eindhoven/London N11 1SS / NL Opponent's representative de Haan, Poul Erik, et al, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Postbus 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | 16.03.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.09.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.07.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 05.07.2012 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2012/48] | 05.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 18.01.2010 | Appeal received No. T0092/10 | 22.03.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 14.01.2010 | Appeal received No. T0092/10 | 22.03.2010 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 05.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.07.2012 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 03.12.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 02.12.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   04.02.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.05.2006 | BE | 10.05.2006 | CH | 10.05.2006 | CY | 10.05.2006 | FI | 10.05.2006 | LI | 10.05.2006 | NL | 10.05.2006 | DK | 10.08.2006 | SE | 10.08.2006 | GR | 11.08.2006 | LU | 20.08.2006 | IE | 21.08.2006 | MC | 31.08.2006 | PT | 10.10.2006 | [2011/32] |
Former [2011/28] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CY | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
LU | 20.08.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
IT | 20.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/02] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
CY | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
LU | 20.08.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/36] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
LU | 20.08.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
GR | 11.08.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
IE | 21.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
BE | 10.05.2006 | ||
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
NL | 10.05.2006 | ||
DK | 10.08.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
MC | 31.08.2006 | ||
PT | 10.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
CH | 10.05.2006 | ||
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
LI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 10.05.2006 | |
FI | 10.05.2006 | ||
SE | 10.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 10.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3321114 (CROYLE JACK V) [X] 1-7,10-15,21 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 40; figure 3 *; | [X]US3618825 (CLARKE ROBERT E) [X] 1-7,10-15,19,21 * column 1, line 57 - column 3, line 34 *; | [X]FR2305361 (ASTRA PLASTIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-7,10-15,19,21 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 31 *; | [X]US4102476 (LOEFFLER HERBERT H) [X] 1-16,19,21 * column 3, line 24 - column 5, line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE2704164 (BACHMANN) [X] 1-12,15,16,19,21 * pages 4-5 *; | [X]GB1593084 (METAL BOX CO LTD) [X] 1-7,10-15,19,21 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 100 *; | [X]EP0473994 (KAUTEX WERKE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-16,19,21 * column 5, line 40 - column 10, line 2; figure 2 *; | [X]GB2258860 (POLYTOP PLASTICS [GB]) [X] 1-16,21 * pages 5-7 *; | [X]US5651471 (GREEN DENNIS E [US]) [X] 1,3-6,10-14,19,20 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 7; figures 8,9 *; | [A]US5706973 (ROBBINS III EDWARD S [US], et al) [A] 4,13-15 * the whole document *; | [A]NL1005120C (IPPC INTERNATIONAL PRODUCT PRO [NL]) [A] 4,13-15 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO9908578 (HAKIM NOURI E [US], et al) [PA] 4,13-15,20* the whole document * | International search | [A]US4836404 (COY PETER [US]); | [X]US5542670 (MORANO EMANUEL P [US]); | [A]US5702025 (DI GREGORIO VITO [US]) |