Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4593787B | Global Dossier | 08.12.2010 | B2 | JP2002529218 | 10.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 | EP9906194 | 24.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1131149 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2003 | B1 | EP1131149 | 12.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 | EP9906194 | 24.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE251938T | 15.11.2003 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 | EP9906194 | 24.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59907394D1 | 20.11.2003 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 | EP9906194 | 24.08.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6599421 | 29.07.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 | EP9906194 | 24.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0027502 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19851193 | 13.04.2000 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2209496T | 16.06.2004 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19851193 | 06.11.1998 |