|
08.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2003 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2002 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.06.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2002 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
22.05.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2001 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2001 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2001 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.04.2001 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2001 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2001 |
Preparation for B publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
07.12.2000 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
10 |
|
16.11.2000 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.11.2000 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
05.06.2000 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
29.05.2000 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.04.2000 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.04.2000 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
06.04.2000 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
04.04.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
30.03.2000 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.2000 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
21 |
|
05.10.1999 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |