EP1099197 - DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING OUTPUT DATA IN REACTION TO INPUT DATA, METHOD FOR CHECKING AUTHENTICITY AND METHOD FOR ENCRYPTED DATA TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/20] | For all designated states FRAUNHOFER-GESELLSCHAFT ZUR FÖRDERUNG DER ANGEWANDTEN FORSCHUNG E.V. Leonrodstrasse 54 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OELMAIER, Florian Hirtenstrasse 5 D-85386 Eching / DE | 02 /
BRAND, Roland Pfinzingweg 13 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
HEUER, André Stintzingstrasse 29 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
GERHÄUSER, Heinz Saugendorf 17 D-91344 Waischenfeld / DE | 05 /
PROSCH, Markus Fürther Strasse 31 D-91058 Erlangen / DE | 06 /
KORTE, Olaf Etlaswind 19 D-91338 Igensdorf / DE | 07 /
PLANKENBÜHLER, Roland Grazer Strasse 7 D-90475 Nürnberg / DE | [2001/20] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2001/20] | Schoppe, Fritz, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler, Postfach 71 08 67 81458 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99944537.2 | 27.08.1999 | [2001/20] | WO1999EP06312 | Priority number, date | DE19981043424 | 22.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19843424 | [2001/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017826 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1099197 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1099197 | Date: | 02.10.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2001/20] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP);
G06Q20/341 (EP);
G06Q20/40975 (EP);
G07F7/082 (EP);
H01L23/576 (EP);
H04L9/06 (EP);
H04L9/0877 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP);
H01L2924/12044 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM LIEFERN VON AUSGANGSDATEN ALS REAKTION AUF EINGANGSDATEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERPRÜFEN DER AUTHENTIZITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERSCHLÜSSELTEN ÜBERTRAGEN VON INFORMATIONEN | [2001/20] | English: | DEVICE FOR SUPPLYING OUTPUT DATA IN REACTION TO INPUT DATA, METHOD FOR CHECKING AUTHENTICITY AND METHOD FOR ENCRYPTED DATA TRANSMISSION | [2001/20] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR FOURNIR DES DONNEES DE SORTIE EN REACTION A DES DONNEES D'ENTREE, PROCEDE DE VERIFICATION D'AUTHENTICITE, ET PROCEDE DE TRANSFERT CODE D'INFORMATIONS | [2001/20] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/20] | 09.03.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 26.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0313967 (GAO GES AUTOMATION ORG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,7,10-12 * column 1, paragraph 3 * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 3 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 5 * * column 7, line 29 - line 33 * * column 8, line 17 - line 26 * [A] 2,6,13,16 [Y] 17,18; | [Y]EP0654919 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 18* abstract *; | [YA] - W. RANKL & W. EFFING, Handbuch der Chipkarten, MÜNCHEN WIEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, (19980210), 022759, XP002127583 [Y] 17 * page 276 - page 277 * * figure 8.13 * [A] 1,4,5 |