EP1076065 - POLYPEPTIDE HAVING ANTIHUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS ACTIVITY, GENE ENCODING THE POLYPEPTIDE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE POLYPEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIIM Pharm Lab. Inc. 5-5-1, Tyuoudai-iino Iwaki City Fukushima 970-8551 / JP | [2008/31] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states KIIM Parm Lab. Inc. 5-5-1, Tyuoudai-iino Iwaki City Fukushima 970-8551 / JP | ||
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Gakkou Houjin Kitasato Gakuen 9-1, Shirogane 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8641 / JP | ||
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Gakkou Houjin Kitasato Gakuen 9-1, Shirogane 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8641 / JP | ||
For all designated states Japan Society for the Promotion of Science 3-1, Koujimachi 5-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8471 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Haruo 10-8, Morino 3-chome Machida-shi, Tokyo 194-0022 / JP | 02 /
OHMURA, Satoshi 3-12, Okamoto 3-chome Setagaya-ku, Tokyo 157-0076 / JP | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99944793.1 | 22.09.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999JP05199 | Priority number, date | JP19990056960 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5696099 | JP19990058434 | 05.03.1999 Original published format: JP 5843499 | [2001/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0052043 | Date: | 08.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1076065 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1076065 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/36, C12N15/31, C12P21/02 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
C07K14/36 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPEPTID MIT AKTIVITÄT GEGEN DAS HUMANE IMMUNDEFIZIENZ VIRUS, DAFÜR KODIERENDE GENE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES POLYPEPTIDS | [2001/07] | English: | POLYPEPTIDE HAVING ANTIHUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS ACTIVITY, GENE ENCODING THE POLYPEPTIDE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE POLYPEPTIDE | [2001/07] | French: | POLYPEPTIDE EXERCANT UNE ACTION CONTRE LE VIRUS DE L'IMMUNODEFICIENCE HUMAINE, GENE CODANT POUR CE POLYPEPTIDE, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE POLYPEPTIDE | [2007/44] |
Former [2001/07] | POLYPEPTIDE EXER ANT UNE ACTION CONTRE LE VIRUS DE L'IMMUNODEFICIENCE HUMAINE, GENE CODANT POUR CE POLYPEPTIDE, ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CE POLYPEPTIDE | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2000 | Translation filed | 03.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2000 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 15.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.07.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | [2010/19] |
Former [2010/06] | IT | 30.07.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH07508746 ; | [A] - TANAKA H. ET AL., "Chloropeptins, New Anti-HIV Antibiotics Inhibiting gp120-CD4 Binding from Streptomyces sp.", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (199701), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 58 - 65, XP002925771 | [A] - MATSUZAKI K. ET AL., "Chloropeptins, New Anti-HIV Antibiotics Inhibiting gp120-CD4 Binding from Streptomyces sp.", THE JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (199701), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 66 - 69, XP002925772 |