EP1118903 - REFLECTION LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Ohaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATANAKA, Takayuki 122-1-223, Onuka 3-chome Kanazawa-shi, Isikawa 921-8147 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Shingo 1-328-403, Oshino, Nonoichi-machi Ishikawa-gun, Isikawa 921-8802 / JP | 03 /
OGAWA, Tetsu 18-8, Yayoi-2chome Kanazawa-shi, Isikawa 921-8036 / JP | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2001/30] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 99944833.5 | 27.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999JP05245 | Priority number, date | JP19980276076 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: JP 27607698 | [2001/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019267 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118903 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118903 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
G02F1/133553 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
G02F1/133504 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/133528 (KR);
G02F1/13363 (KR);
G02F2203/02 (KR);
G02F2203/03 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | REFLEKTIERENDE FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE | [2001/30] | English: | REFLECTION LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY | [2001/30] | French: | AFFICHAGES A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES REFLECHISSANTS | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2001 | Translation filed | 28.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2001 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 22.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0756157 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]JPH07234402 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH10206837 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) |