EP1117812 - PLANT PROMOTERS AND PLANT TERMINATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2006/46] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIKAWA, Satomi 15-10-402, Kusunoki-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo 659-0015 / JP | 02 /
OEDA, Kenji, 251-1-202, Kamigoryokamie-cho Kuramaguchidorimuromachihigashiiru, Kita-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 603-8147 / JP | [2006/17] |
Former [2001/30] | 01 /
NISHIKAWA, Satomi 15-10-402, Kusunoki-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo 659-0015 / JP | ||
02 /
OEDA, Kenji, 251-1, Kamigoryokamie-cho Kuramaguchidorimuromach, Ihigashiiru, Kita-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 603-8147 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99944878.0 | 28.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999JP05303 | Priority number, date | JP19980281124 | 02.10.1998 Original published format: JP 28112498 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020613 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117812 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1117812 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/82, C12N5/10 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
C12N15/8222 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLANZLICHE PROMOTOREN UND TERMINATOREN | [2001/30] | English: | PLANT PROMOTERS AND PLANT TERMINATORS | [2001/30] | French: | PROMOTEURS ET TERMINATEURS DU DOMAINE VEGETAL | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 21.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.11.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0659884 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] * see seq.ID.6;; example 5 *; | [A]EP0824150 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] * the whole document * |