EP1075331 - A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR CLEANING OF A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB Hans Stahles Väg 147 80 Tumba / SE | [2010/42] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Alfa Laval Corporate AB Hans Stables Väg 147 80 Tumba / SE | ||
Former [2001/07] | For all designated states Alfa Laval AB Hans Stahles väg 147 80 Tumba / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PITKÄMÄKI, Jouko Odlingsvägen 26 S-147 50 Tumba / SE | [2001/07] | Representative(s) | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/07] | Lerwill, John, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 99944961.4 | 17.08.1999 | [2001/07] | WO1999SE01382 | Priority number, date | SE19980002816 | 24.08.1998 Original published format: SE 9802816 | SE19980003035 | 08.09.1998 Original published format: SE 9803035 | [2001/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0010715 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1075331 | Date: | 14.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1075331 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B04B15/06 | [2001/07] | CPC: |
B04B11/082 (EP,US);
B04B15/06 (EP,KR,US);
B04B1/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2004/22] |
Former [2001/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM REINIGEN EINER TRENNZENTRIFUGE | [2001/07] | English: | A METHOD AND A DEVICE FOR CLEANING OF A CENTRIFUGAL SEPARATOR | [2001/07] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE NETTOYAGE D'UN SEPARATEUR CENTRIFUGE | [2001/07] | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2000 | Examination requested [2001/07] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.10.2010 | [2011/35] | Cited in | International search | [X]US4784635 (BRUNING PAUL [DE], et al); | [A]US5041075 (BRUNING PAUL [DE], et al); | [A]US5104371 (AJNEFORS FREDRIK [SE]) |