EP1109576 - IMMUNOGENIC BETA-PROPIONAMIDO-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE PROTEIN CONJUGATE USEFUL AS A VACCINE PRODUCED USING AN N-ACRYLOYLATED POLYSACCHARIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Hertistrasse 2 8306 Wallisellen / CH | [2003/50] |
Former [2003/46] | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Hertistrasse 2 8304 Wallisellen / CH | ||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states NORTH AMERICAN VACCINE, INC. 10150 Old Columbia Road Columbia, MD 21046 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHON, Francis 4401 Rosedale Avenue Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
HUANG, Chun-Hsien 9815 Bald Cypress Drive Bethesda, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
UITZ, Catherine 4126 North 34th Road Arlington, VA 22207 / US | [2001/26] | Representative(s) | Miles, John Stephen, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2003/46] | Miles, John Stephen, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2001/26] | Miles, John Stephen Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99945115.6 | 18.08.1999 | [2001/26] | WO1999US18982 | Priority number, date | US19980097120P | 19.08.1998 Original published format: US 97120 P | US19990376911 | 18.08.1999 Original published format: US 376911 | [2001/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0010599 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1109576 | Date: | 27.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1109576 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385 | [2001/26] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/54 (EP);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6037 (EP,US);
A61K2039/627 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/26] | Extension states | SI | 19.03.2001 | Title | German: | IMMUNOGENES BETA-PROPIONAMIDO-GEBUNDENES POLYSACCHARID-PROTEIN KONJUGAT GEEIGNET ALS IMPFSTOFF UND HERGESTELLT BEI VERWENDUNG VON N-ACRYLOYLIERTEM POLYSACCHARID | [2001/26] | English: | IMMUNOGENIC BETA-PROPIONAMIDO-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE PROTEIN CONJUGATE USEFUL AS A VACCINE PRODUCED USING AN N-ACRYLOYLATED POLYSACCHARIDE | [2001/26] | French: | CONJUGUE DE PROTEINE-POLYSACCHARIDE IMMUNOGENE A LIAISON BETA-PROPIONAMIDO, UTILE COMME VACCIN ETABLI AU MOYEN D'UN POLYSACCHARIDE N-ACRYLOYLE | [2001/26] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/26] | 20.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.10.2009 | BE | 21.10.2009 | CY | 21.10.2009 | DK | 21.10.2009 | FI | 21.10.2009 | IT | 21.10.2009 | NL | 21.10.2009 | SE | 21.10.2009 | GR | 22.01.2010 | ES | 01.02.2010 | PT | 22.02.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/37] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
CY | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
IT | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
GR | 22.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
DK | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/29] | AT | 21.10.2009 | |
BE | 21.10.2009 | ||
FI | 21.10.2009 | ||
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | FI | 21.10.2009 | |
SE | 21.10.2009 | ||
ES | 01.02.2010 | ||
PT | 22.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 01.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4356170 (JENNINGS HAROLD J, et al) [A] 1-58* examples 1-3; claims 1-26 *; | [XY]US4727136 (JENNINGS HAROLD J [CA], et al) [X] 15,48-58 * column 1, line 1 - column 8, line 39 * [Y] 1-14,16-47; | [XY]US5576002 (JENNINGS HAROLD J [CA], et al) [X] 15,48-58 * column 3, line 7 - column 11, line 5; claims 1-38 * [Y] 1-14,16-47; | [X]WO9640239 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA]) [X] 1-58 * page 1, line 24 - page 9, line 35; examples 1-8; tables 1-3 *; | [XY] - JENNINGS H J ET AL, "Induction of meningococcal group B polysaccharide-specific IgG antibodies in mice by using an N-propionylated B polysaccharide-tetanus toxoid conjugate vaccine.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1986 SEP 1) 137 (5) 1708-13., XP002052677 [X] 15,48-58 * abstract, "materials and methods" starting at page 1708 and "discussion" starting at page 1711 * [Y] 1-14,16-47 | [XY] - JENNINGS H J ET AL, "Unique intermolecular bactericidal epitope involving the homosialopolysaccharide capsule on the cell surface of group B Neisseria meningitidis and Escherichia coli K1.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1989 MAY 15) 142 (10) 3585-91., XP000872571 [X] 15,48-58 * abstract * [Y] 1-14,16-47 | [XY] - FUSCO P C ET AL, "Preclinical evaluation of a novel group B meningococcal conjugate vaccine that elicits bactericidal activity in both mice and nonhuman primates.", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, (1997 FEB) 175 (2) 364-72., XP000291371 [X] 15,48-58 * abstract * * page 364, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 366, column 2, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-14,16-47 | [XY] - FUSCO, PETER C. ET AL, "Meningococcal vaccine development: a novel approach", EXPERT OPIN. INVEST. DRUGS (1998), 7(2), 245-252, XP000872557 [X] 15,48-58 * abstract * * page 245, line 1 - page 247, column 1, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-14,16-47 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.7.2.245 | [XY] - GRANOFF D M ET AL, "Bactericidal monoclonal antibodies that define unique meningococcal B polysaccharide epitopes that do not cross-react with human polysialic acid.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (1998 MAY 15) 160 (10) 5028-36., XP000872887 [X] 15,48-58 * abstract and "materials and methods" starting at page 5029 * [Y] 1-14,16-47 | [XY] - JENNINGS H J ET AL, "Chemically modified Group B meninggococcal polysaccharides as human vaccines", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL MEETING: SYMPOSIUM ON THE APPLICATIONS AND MODIFICATIONS OF INDUSTRIAL POLYSACCHARIDES,NL,AMSTERDAM, ELSEVIER, (1987), vol. MEETING 193, pages 149 - 156, XP002016901 [X] 15,48-58 * page 150, line 9 - page 156, line 3 * [Y] 1-14,16-47 | Examination | - W.E. DICK ET AL., "Glycoconjugates of Bacterial carbohydrate Antigens.", CONJUGATE VACCINES, (1989), vol. 10, pages 48 - 114 |