19.08.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] |
27.08.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.10.2004 [2004/42] |
20.08.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.08.2004 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
16.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
16.07.2004 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.03.2004 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.03.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
05.03.2004 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.04.2004 [2004/17] |
02.03.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.12.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.09.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.02.2003 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
21.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.02.2003 |
Change - request for further processing |
|
04.12.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
01.11.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.12.2002 [2002/51] |
30.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.08.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.06.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.02.2002 |
First examination report |
|
19.02.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
20.07.2001 |
Change - priority |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
05.05.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] |
05.05.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.06.2001 [2001/25] |
03.05.2001 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.03.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.03.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
16.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.04.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|