EP1107746 - METHODS OF USING AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING DOPAMINE REUPTAKE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sepracor Inc. 84 Waterford Drive Marlborough, Massachusetts 01752 / US | [2002/51] |
Former [2001/25] | For all designated states Sepracor Inc. 111 Locke Drive Marlborough, MA 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JERUSSI, Thomas, P. 19 Garvey Road Framingham, MA 01701 / US | 02 /
SENANAYAKE, Chrisantha, H. 11 Old Farm Circle Shrewbury, MA 01545 / US | 03 /
FANG, Qun, K. 35 Atwood Street Wellesley, MA 02181 / US | [2001/25] | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/25] | Hughes, Siân Victoria, et al Venner, Shipley & Co 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99945137.0 | 23.08.1999 | [2001/25] | WO1999US19167 | Priority number, date | US19980097665P | 24.08.1998 Original published format: US 97665 P | US19980099306P | 02.09.1998 Original published format: US 99306 P | US19990372158 | 11.08.1999 Original published format: US 372158 | [2001/36] |
Former [2001/25] | US19980097665P | 24.08.1998 | |
US19980099306P | 02.09.1998 | ||
US19990372158 | 23.08.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0010551 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1107746 | Date: | 20.06.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1107746 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/13, A61K31/135, A61P25/28 | [2004/17] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/135 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/11 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/08 (EP);
A61P15/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/11, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/135, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/137, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K45/06, A61K31/135 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2001/25] | A61K31/13, A61K31/135 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/25] | Extension states | AL | 28.02.2001 | LT | 28.02.2001 | LV | 28.02.2001 | MK | 28.02.2001 | RO | 28.02.2001 | SI | 28.02.2001 | Title | German: | VERWENDUNGSMETHODEN UND ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN DIE EINEN DOPAMINEWIEDERAUFNAHMEINHIBITOR ENTHALTEN | [2001/25] | English: | METHODS OF USING AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING DOPAMINE REUPTAKE INHIBITORS | [2001/25] | French: | PROCEDES D'UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE RECAPTAGE DE LA DOPAMINE ET COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT CES DERNIERS | [2001/25] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 24.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 09.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04018454.1 / EP1475086 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Request for further processing for: | 18.02.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 18.02.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.03.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3212682 (BOOTS CO LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,20-24,27,29,44,59-66,75-77 * abstract * * page 18, paragraph 1; claims 44-46 * * page 24, paragraph 1; examples 1C,4K, *; | [X]WO8806444 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1-7,27-30,59-69,72-77 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 3; claims 1-8 *; | [A]US4939175 (UKAI KIYOHARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-7,27-30,59-69,72-77 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9400047 (SEPRACOR INC [US]) [Y] 20-24,27-29,44 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 2 *; | [X]WO9521615 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,27-29,59-67 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 24 * * page 20, paragraph 3 *; | [X]EP0781561 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 8,14-16* page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 27; claims 1-3 *; | [X]WO9813034 (KNOLL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,25,26,42,43,49,50,57,59-69,72-77 * abstract *; | [PX]WO9933450 (KNOLL AG [DE], et al) [PX] 1-7,25,26,42,43,49,50,57,59-69,72-77 * abstract * * page 2, lines 1-10 *; | [X] - LUSCOMBE G P ET AL, "THE CONTRIBUTION OF METABOLITES TO THE RAPID AND POTENT DOWN-REGULATION OF RAT CORTICAL BETA-ADRENOCEPTORS BY THE PUTATIVE ANTIDEPRESSANT SIBUTRAMINE HYDROCHLORIDE", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY,GB,PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, (19890201), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 0028-3908, pages 129 - 134, XP000613753 [X] 1-7,20-24,27,29,44,59-66,75-77 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(89)90048-8 | [X] - HEAL, D. J. ET AL, "A comparison of the effects on central 5-HT function of sibutramine hydrochloride and other weight-modifying agents", BR. J. PHARMACOL. (1998), 125(2), 301-308, XP000905054 [X] 1-7,25,26,42,43,49,50,57,59-69,72-77 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0702067 | [X] - CHEETHAM, S. C. ET AL, "[3H]Paroxetine binding in rat frontal cortex strongly correlates with [3H]5-HT uptake: effect of administration of various antidepressant treatments", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY (1993), 32(8), 737-43, XP000905163 [X] 1-7,20-24,27,29,44,59-66,75-77 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-3908(93)90181-2 | [XY] - JEFFERY, JAMES E. ET AL, "Synthesis of sibutramine, a novel cyclobutylalkylamine useful in the treatment of obesity, and its major human metabolites", J. CHEM. SOC., PERKIN TRANS. 1 (1996), (21), 2583-2589, XP002137121 [X] 1-7,25,26,42,43,49,50,57,59-69,72-77 * page 2583, column 1, paragraphs 1-3 * [Y] 20-24,27-32,44 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/p19960002583 | [Y] - GRAY, A. M.; SPENCER, P. S. J.; SEWELL, R. D. E., "The involvement of the opioidergic system in the antinociceptive mechanism of action of antidepressant compounds", BR. J. PHARMACOL., (1998), vol. 124, no. 4, pages 669 - 674, XP000909217 [Y] 30-32 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjp.0701882 | Examination | - STOCK M.J., "Sibutramine: a review of the pharmacology of a novel anti-obesity agent", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF OBESITY, (1997), vol. 21, no. SP.1, pages S25 - S29 |