EP1112354 - NOVEL PROTEIN KINASE MOLECULES AND USES THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MILLENNIUM PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge Massachusetts 02139 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | For all designated states Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 75 Sidney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACTON, Susan 42 Munroe Road Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2001/27] | Representative(s) | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP Unit A, Faraday Court Faraday Road Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9PU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/27] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence, The Old College, 53 High Street Horley, Surrey RH6 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 99945606.4 | 09.09.1999 | [2001/27] | WO1999US20631 | Priority number, date | US19980099657P | 09.09.1998 Original published format: US 99657 P | US19980163115 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: US 163115 | [2001/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014212 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1112354 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/20, C12N9/12, C07K16/00, C07H21/04, G01N33/53, C12N5/00 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/5005 (EP,US);
A61N1/3655 (EP,US);
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
C12Q1/48 (EP,US);
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
G01N33/5008 (EP,US);
G01N33/5014 (EP,US);
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/27] | C12N15/00, C12N5/00, C12N1/20, C12N9/12, C07K16/00, C07H21/04, G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/27] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE PROTEINKINASE MOLEKÜLE SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [2001/27] | English: | NOVEL PROTEIN KINASE MOLECULES AND USES THEREFOR | [2001/27] | French: | NOUVELLES MOLECULES DE PROTEINE KINASE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2001/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/27] | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2009 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 22.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/17] | 10.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO9966051 (SUGEN INC [US], et al) [E] 1-24,26 * NEK-5 protein * * sequences 3,4 *; | [E]WO0022142 (ONYX PHARMA INC [US]) [E] 1-24,26 * figure 2; claim 4 *; | [T] - GOTOH ISAMU ET AL, "Identification and characterization of a novel MAP kinase kinase kinase, MLTK", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010209), vol. 276, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 4276 - 4286, XP002314957 [T] 1-24,26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M008595200 | [T] - BLOEM LAURA J ET AL, "Tissue distribution and functional expression of a cDNA encoding a novel mixed lineage kinase", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR CARDIOLOGY, (200109), vol. 33, no. 9, ISSN 0022-2828, pages 1739 - 1750, XP002314958 [T] 1-24,26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmcc.2001.1437 | International search | [X]WO9811234 (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al) |