EP1117715 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED LOW FOAMING COPOLYMERS, HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED LOW FOAMING COPOLYMERS AND THEIR USE AS CEMENT ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies, Inc. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIFFLER, Juergen Ystadweg 4 D-21682 Stade / DE | 02 /
FROEHLICH, Christoph Moosgaessli 1 CH-8835 Feusisberg / CH | 03 /
STRANIMAIER, Kerstin Ebenau 2 CH-8841 Gross / CH | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | polypatent Postfach 40 02 43 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/50] | Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2001/30] | Sternagel, Hans-Günther, Dr., et al Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte Braunsberger Feld 29 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 99945644.5 | 10.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999US20831 | Priority number, date | EP19980117115 | 10.09.1998 Original published format: EP 98117115 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0014133 | Date: | 16.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117715 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08F283/06, C08F220/04, C08F222/02, C04B24/26 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
C08F283/06 (EP);
C04B24/2647 (EP);
C04B24/267 (EP);
C08F220/04 (EP);
C08F222/02 (EP);
C04B2103/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROPHOBISCH MODIFIZIERTEN, WENIG SCHÄUMENDEN COPOLYMEREN, HYDROPHOBISCH MODIFIZIERTE, WENIG SCHÄUMENDE COPOLYMERE, UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ZEMENTZUSATZSTOFFE | [2004/14] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED LOW FOAMING COPOLYMERS, HYDROPHOBICALLY MODIFIED LOW FOAMING COPOLYMERS AND THEIR USE AS CEMENT ADDITIVES | [2001/30] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PREPARER DES COPOLYMERES FAIBLEMENT MOUSSANTS RENDUS HYDROPHOBES, COPOLYMERES FAIBLEMENT MOUSSANTS RENDUS HYDROPHOBES, ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME ADDITIFS A CIMENT | [2001/30] |
Former [2001/30] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROFOBISCH MODIFIZIERTEN, NIEDRIG SCHÄUMENDEN COPOLYMEREN, HYDROFOBISCH MODIFIZIERTE NIEDRIG SCHÄUMENDE COPOLYMERE, UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS ZEMENTZUSATZSTOFFE | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 05.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/07] | 09.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19653524 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-19 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0754712 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [A] 1 * claims 1,6 *; | [A]WO9739037 (MBT HOLDING AG [CH], et al); | [DA]DE3728786 (SANDOZ AG [DE]); | [DA]EP0306449 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al); | [A]EP0641746 (SANDOZ LTD [CH], et al) |