EP1121323 - DISPENSING LID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oil Safe Systems Pty Ltd 4 Bannick Court Canning Vale Western Australia / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2002/19] | For all designated states Oil Safe Systems Pty Ltd 4 Bannick Court Canning Vale, Western Australia / AU | ||
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Kilian, Michael 4 Bannick Court Canning Vale, W.A. 6155 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kilian, Michael 4 Bannick Court Canning Vale, Western Australia / AU | [2005/30] |
Former [2001/32] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Dealtry, Brian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | Dealtry, Brian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99945769.0 | 13.09.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999AU00756 | Priority number, date | AU1998PP06003 | 17.09.1998 Original published format: AU PP600398 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017091 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121323 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121323 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1121323 | Date: | 24.08.2005 | [2005/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B67D3/00, B65D47/20 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
B65D51/1683 (EP,US);
B65D43/0231 (EP,US);
B65D47/242 (EP,US);
F16N3/04 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00092 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00296 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00518 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00537 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00555 (EP,US);
B65D2543/00842 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG IN FORM EINES DECKELS | [2001/32] | English: | DISPENSING LID | [2001/32] | French: | COUVERCLE DISTRIBUTEUR | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 17.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 18.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.06.2005 | BE | 01.06.2005 | CH | 01.06.2005 | FI | 01.06.2005 | LI | 01.06.2005 | NL | 01.06.2005 | DK | 01.09.2005 | GR | 01.09.2005 | SE | 01.09.2005 | CY | 13.09.2005 | IE | 13.09.2005 | LU | 30.09.2005 | MC | 30.09.2005 | PT | 03.11.2005 | [2007/23] |
Former [2006/40] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
IE | 13.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/30] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
MC | 30.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/26] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
DK | 01.09.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/22] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
NL | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
CH | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
LI | 01.06.2005 | ||
GR | 01.09.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
PT | 03.11.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 01.06.2005 | |
BE | 01.06.2005 | ||
FI | 01.06.2005 | ||
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/52] | FI | 01.06.2005 | |
SE | 01.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/50] | SE | 01.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE205898 (DEHN H C) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US442638 (RALEIGH JOHN A) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 37 - line 86; figure 1 *; | [Y]US705160 (SWANSON JOHN ALBERT [US]) [Y] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1072588 (DUNCAN WILLIAM T [US]) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, line 30 - page 1, line 103; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1373244 (FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ) [A] 1-6 * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 40; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2160976 (JOHN MIRATI) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 51 - column 3, line 41; figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US2306550 (MAILEY CARL F) [Y] 1-6 * column 1, line 46 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-10 *; | [Y]US2799437 (PERCY JEPSON) [Y] 1-6 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 29; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE3632991 (GOLDMANN WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-4* column 2, line 39 - column 3, line 40; figures 1,2 * | International search | [A]US4928856 (WHITE JONATHAN Z [US]); | [A]US4946079 (CAMPBELL JOHN T [US]); | [A]US4966481 (SATTEN ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US5249611 (LAW VERL [US]); | [A]EP0633195 (MONSANTO EUROPE SA [BE]); | [A]US5477980 (CHAFFIN JEFFREY D [US]); | [A]US5775550 (TOLL DUNCAN M [US]) |