26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
05.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2004 [2004/52] |
06.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] |
16.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.09.2004 [2004/36] |
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
10.10.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] |
05.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] |
13.06.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] |
30.05.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
16.05.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] |
18.10.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
04.10.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.08.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
19.07.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.03.2002 |
First examination report |
|
25.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.08.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
13.07.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] |
13.07.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 29.08.2001 [2001/35] |
22.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.10.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|