EP1088018 - ETHER/ESTER DISPERSANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 01.05.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2009 | Revocation of patent | published on 03.06.2009 [2009/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Lubrizol Corporation 29400 Lakeland Boulevard Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US | [2004/49] |
Former [2001/14] | For all designated states Avecia Limited Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THETFORD, Dean PO Box 42, Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [2001/14] | Representative(s) | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | Mallalieu, Catherine Louise, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2004/28] | Mayall, John, et al Intellectual Property Group, Avecia Limited, PO Box 42, Hexagon House, Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [2001/14] | Fawkes, David Melville, et al Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 42, Hexagon House Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99947040.4 | 03.03.1999 | [2001/14] | WO1999GB00642 | Priority number, date | GB19980009116 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9809116 | [2001/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9955762 | Date: | 04.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1088018 | Date: | 04.04.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1088018 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/692, C08G63/664, C08G63/91 | [2001/14] | CPC: |
C08G63/664 (EP,US);
C08G63/6922 (EP,US);
C08G63/912 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2001/14] | Title | German: | ETHER-ESTERDISPERGIERMITTEL | [2001/14] | English: | ETHER/ESTER DISPERSANTS | [2001/14] | French: | AGENTS DE DISPERSION D'ETHER/ESTER | [2001/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/14] | 31.05.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE BYK-Chemie GmbH Abelstrasse 14 D-46483 Wesel / DE Opponent's representative Steffan, Gerhard Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Postfach 10 40 09 40031 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
16.09.2004
ADMISSIBLE BYK-Chemie GmbH Abelstrasse 14 D-46483 Wesel / DE Opponent's representative Steffan, Gerhard Leifert & Steffan Patentanwälte Burgplatz 21/22 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | 04.11.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 13.06.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 06.01.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.01.2009 | 06.01.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 24.01.2009 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2009/23] | 27.01.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.12.2000 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 | 04.12.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   15.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.12.2003 | IE | 03.03.2004 | DK | 17.03.2004 | PT | 17.05.2004 | AT | 03.03.2006 | GR | 02.10.2006 | [2008/48] |
Former [2008/18] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
PT | 17.05.2004 | ||
AT | 03.03.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
AT | 03.03.2006 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
IE | 03.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 17.12.2003 | |
DK | 17.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 17.12.2003 | Cited in | International search | JPS49109104 [ ]; | [XD]US5130463 (HAUBENNESTEL KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [XD] 1-23 * examples 8-16; table 1 * * column 6, line 34 - line 37 *; | [X]EP0558965 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]) [X] 22 * claim 2 *; | [X]WO9534593 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,17-22 * claims 1,4,11-15 * * page 2, line 29 - line 30 * * example 1 *; | [A]WO9636656 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * claim 7 * * page 4, line 31 *; | [X]EP0759440 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,11-14,17-23 * claim 1 * * tables 1A-C * * page 5, line 54 - line 57 *; | [AD]WO9719948 (ZENECA LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1,14* claim 1 *; | [X] - "Photopolymers for flexographic printing plates", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19750616), vol. 82, no. 24, Database accession no. 163055, XP002104476 [X] 22 * abstract * |