Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3464456B | Global Dossier | 10.11.2003 | B2 | JP2002527319 | 27.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19848532 | 21.10.1998 | EP9906826 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1123247 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2002 | B1 | EP1123247 | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19848532 | 21.10.1998 | EP9906826 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59903430D1 | 19.12.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19848532 | 21.10.1998 | EP9906826 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6409118 | 25.06.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19848532 | 21.10.1998 | EP9906826 | 15.09.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0023364 | Global Dossier | 27.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19848532 | 21.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19848532 | 27.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19848532 | 21.10.1998 |