EP1123247 - CONTACT ROLLERS FOR A WINDING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kampf GmbH & Co. Maschinenfabrik Mühlener Strasse 36-42 D-51674 Wiehl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/33] | For all designated states Kampf GmbH & Co. Maschinenfabrik Mühlener Strasse 36-42 D-51674 Wiehl / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUTZENLAUB, Armin Am Stichelberg 24 D-51674 Wiehl / DE | 02 /
KUNKEL, Dietmar Horst-Köhler-Strasse 35 D-51674 Wiehl / DE | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2001/33] | Thul, Hermann, Dipl.-Phys. Zentrale Patentabteilung, Rheinmetall AG, Rheinmetall Allee 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 99947355.6 | 15.09.1999 | [2001/33] | WO1999EP06826 | Priority number, date | DE1998148532 | 21.10.1998 Original published format: DE 19848532 | [2001/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023364 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123247 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123247 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65H18/26, B65H19/22, B65H27/00 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
B65H27/00 (EP,US);
B65H18/26 (EP,US);
F16C19/55 (EP,US);
F16C23/10 (EP,US);
F16C3/22 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4148 (EP,US);
B65H2402/30 (EP,US);
B65H2404/1321 (EP,US);
B65H2404/13211 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2002/46] |
Former [2001/33] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | KONTAKTWALZENSYSTEM EINER WICKELMASCHINE | [2001/33] | English: | CONTACT ROLLERS FOR A WINDING MACHINE | [2001/33] | French: | SYSTEME DE CYLINDRES DE CONTACT D'UNE ENROULEUSE | [2001/33] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/33] | 16.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 13.11.2002 | FR | 13.11.2002 | GB | 13.11.2002 | IT | 13.11.2002 | [2008/18] |
Former [2006/14] | FI | 13.11.2002 | |
FR | 13.11.2002 | ||
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
Former [2004/22] | FI | 13.11.2002 | |
GB | 13.11.2002 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 13.11.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2343677 (AHLSTROEM OY [FI]) [A] 1,8 * figure - *; | [AD]DE3941384 (KAMPF GMBH & CO MASCHINENFABRIK) [AD] 1,3,8,9 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [PA]WO9941174 (KAMPF GMBH & CO MASCHF [DE], et al) [PA] 1,8* figure -; claim 1 * |