EP1118227 - METHOD AND SERVER FOR PROCESSING INTELLIGENT NETWORK CALLS IN INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICE CALL NUMBER PORTABILITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/30] | METHOD FOR PROCESSING INTELLIGENT NETWORK CALLS IN INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICE CALL NUMBER PORTABILITY | ||
[2005/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2007 [2007/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZYGAN-MAUS, Renate Glötzleweg 35 D-81477 München / DE | 02 /
RUCKSTUHL, Hanspeter Wolframstrasse 20 D-82515 Wolfratshausen / DE | [2001/30] | Application number, filing date | 99947452.1 | 01.10.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999EP07311 | Priority number, date | EP19980118584 | 01.10.1998 Original published format: EP 98118584 | [2001/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0021309 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1118227 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1118227 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
H04Q3/005 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13093 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13097 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13102 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13204 (EP,US);
H04Q2213/13345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SERVER ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON IN-CALLS BEI IN-DIENSTRUFNUMMERNPORTABILITÄT | [2005/40] | English: | METHOD AND SERVER FOR PROCESSING INTELLIGENT NETWORK CALLS IN INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICE CALL NUMBER PORTABILITY | [2005/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET SERVEUR DE TRAITEMENT D'APPELS DANS UN RESEAU INTELLIGENT AVEC PORTABILITE DE NUMEROS DE SERVICES DE RESEAU INTELLIGENT | [2005/40] |
Former [2001/30] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON IN-CALLS BEI IN-DIENSTRUFNUMMERNPORTABILITÄT | ||
Former [2001/30] | METHOD FOR PROCESSING INTELLIGENT NETWORK CALLS IN INTELLIGENT NETWORK SERVICE CALL NUMBER PORTABILITY | ||
Former [2001/30] | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'APPELS DANS UN RESEAU INTELLIGENT AVEC PORTABILITE DE NUMEROS DE SERVICES DE RESEAU INTELLIGENT | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 09.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0827319 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,8,9 * column 8, line 35 - column 9, line 30 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 29 *; | [A]US5764745 (CHAN MAY Y [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7-10 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 17; figure 6 * * column 11, lines 1-21 *; | [A] - SWIFT D J ET AL, "NUMBER PORTABILITY-AN OPPORTUNITY FOR ALTERNATIVE CARRIERS", BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENGINEERING, (199808), vol. 17, no. PART 02, pages 83 - 87, XP000777425 [A] 1,7,8,10 * page 83, column 2 * * page 86, column 3 - page 87, column 2 * | [A] - GIORDANO A ET AL, "PCS NUMBER PORTABILITY", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS, (19940918), pages 1146 - 1150, XP002037912 [A] 1-3,5,7-10 * figure 2 * |